Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4018 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2024

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4018 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 25, 2024 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 4018 	By: McBride, Menz, Dollens, and 
Munson of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Seifried of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation; amending 68 
O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as amended by S ection 1, 
Chapter 139, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 
2357.403), which relates to affordable housing tax 
credits; providing for reallocation of credits; and 
providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 139, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2023, 
Section 2357.403), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 2357.403 A.  This act shall be known and may be cited 
as the "Oklahoma Affordable Housing Act ". 
B.  As used in this section: 
1.  "Allocation year" means the year for which the Oklahoma 
Housing Finance Agency allocates credits pursuant to this section; 
2.  "Eligibility statement " means a statement author ized and 
issued by the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency certifying that a   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4018 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
given project qualifies for the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax 
Credit authorized by this section.  The Oklahoma Housing Finance 
Agency, under Title 330, Oklahoma Housing Finance Agen cy, Chapter 
36, Affordable Housing Tax Credit Program Rules, shall promulgate 
rules establishing criteria upon which the eligibility statements 
will be issued.  The eligibility statement shall sp ecify the amount 
of Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits a llocated to a qualified 
project.  The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency shall only authorize 
the tax credits created by this section to qualified projects which 
are placed in service after July 1, 2015, but which shall not be 
used to reduce tax liability acc ruing prior to January 1, 2016; 
3.  "Federal low-income housing tax credit " means the federal 
tax credit as provided in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986, as amended; 
4.  "Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credit " means the tax 
credit created by this section; 
5.  "Qualified project" means a qualified low -income building as 
that term is defined in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986, as amended; and 
6.  "Taxpayer" means a person, firm or corporation subject to 
the tax imposed by Secti on 2355 of this title or an insurance 
company subject to the tax imposed by Section 624 or 628 of Title 36 
of the Oklahoma Statutes or other financial institution subject to 
the tax imposed by Se ction 2370 of this title.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4018 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
C.  For qualified projects placed i n service after July 1, 2015, 
the amount of state tax credits created by this section which are 
allocated to a project shall not exceed that of the federal low -
income housing tax credits for a qualified project.  The total 
Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax C redits allocated to all qualified 
projects for an allocation year shall not exceed Four Million 
Dollars ($4,000,000.00).  For purposes of this section, the "credit 
period" shall mean the period o f ten (10) taxable years and "placed 
in service" shall have the same meaning as is applicable under the 
federal credit program.  Reallocated and rolled over credits will 
count against the four-million-dollar limit of their original 
allocation year and not count against the limit of the year in which 
they are allocated. 
D.  A taxpayer owning an interest in an investment in a 
qualified project shall be allowed Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax 
Credits under this section for tax years beginning on or after 
January 1, 2016, if the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency issues an 
eligibility statement for such project, which tax credit shall be 
allocated among some or all of the partners, members or shareholders 
of the taxpayer owning such interest in any manner agreed to by such 
partners, members or shareholders.  Such taxpayer ma y assign its 
interest in the investment. 
E.  An insurance company claiming a credit against state premium 
tax or retaliatory tax or any other tax imposed by Section 624 or   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4018 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
628 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes shall not be required to 
pay any additional retaliatory tax under Section 628 of Title 36 of 
the Oklahoma Statutes as a result of claiming the credit.  The 
credit may fully offset any retaliatory tax imposed by Section 628 
of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
F.  The credit authorized by this sect ion shall not be used to 
reduce the tax liability of the taxpayer to less than zero ($0.00). 
G.  Any credit claimed but not used in a taxable year may be 
carried forward two (2) subsequent taxabl e years. 
H.  The owner of a qualified project eligible for th e credit 
authorized by this section shall submit, at the time of filing the 
tax return with the Oklahoma Tax Commission, an eligibility 
statement from the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency.  In the case of 
failure to attach the eligibility statement, no cred it under this 
section shall be allowed with respect to such project for that year 
until required documents are provided to the Tax Commission. 
I.  If under Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as 
amended, a portion of any federal low -income housing credits taken 
on a qualified project is required to be recaptured during the first 
ten (10) years after a project is placed in service, the taxpayer 
claiming Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits with respect to 
such project shall also be required t o recapture a portion of such 
credits.  The amount of Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credits   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB4018 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
subject to recapture shall be proportionally equal to the amount of 
federal low-income housing credit s subject to recapture. 
J.  The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agen cy or the Oklahoma Tax 
Commission may require the filing of additional documentation 
necessary to determine the accuracy of a tax credit claimed. 
K.  The Oklahoma Affordable Housing Act shall undergo a review 
every five (5) years by a committee of nine (9) persons, to be 
appointed three persons each by the Governor, President Pro Tempore 
of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall beco me effective November 1, 2024. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON FINANCE 
March 25, 2024 - DO PASS