Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4044 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/29/2024

                     
 
Req. No. 10633 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 4044 	By: McCall 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation; providing 
procedures for compliance with certain tax laws; 
authorizing waiver of p enalty and interest; 
specifying tax types with respect to which wavier 
allowable; imposing limitations and conditions on 
taxpayer participation; prescribing procedures; 
providing for administrative rules; restric ting 
procedures based upon status as appointed or elected 
official; authorizing utilization of procedures 
notwithstanding statutory provisions; providing for 
codification; and providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 216.6 of Title 68, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  For the purpose of encouraging the vol untary disclosure and 
payment of taxes owed to this state, the Oklahoma Tax Commission is 
hereby authorized and directed to establish a Voluntary Disclosure 
Initiative for eligible taxes, as provided in this sec tion.  A 
taxpayer shall be entitled to a waiv er of penalty, interest and   
 
Req. No. 10633 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
other collection fees due on eligible taxes if the taxpayer 
voluntarily files delin quent tax returns and pays the taxes due 
during the disclosure initiative.  The time in which a volu ntary 
payment of tax liability may be made or the taxpayer may enter into 
a payment program acceptable to the Tax Commission for payment of 
the unpaid taxes in full in the manner and time established in a 
written payment program agreement between the Tax C ommission and the 
taxpayer under the Voluntar y Disclosure Initiative shall be 
applicable with respect to the enumerated tax types in this section 
for all periods beginning January 1, 2020, and ending December 31 , 
2024 and the taxpayer shall be required to make application to the 
Tax Commission during the period beginning January 1, 2025, and 
ending December 31, 2025. 
B.  Upon payment of the eligible taxes under the Voluntary 
Disclosure Initiative established, the Tax Comm ission shall abate 
and not seek to coll ect any interest, penalties or collection fees 
that would otherwise be applicable. 
C.  As used in this section, "eligible taxes" shall include the 
following taxes that were due and payable for the tax period or 
periods prescribed by subsection A of this se ction before entering 
into an agreement as provided in the initiative: 
1.  Mixed beverage tax levied pursuant to Section 576 of Title 
37 of the Oklahoma Statutes;   
 
Req. No. 10633 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Gasoline and diesel tax levied pursuant to Sec tion 500.4 of 
Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 
3.  Gross production and petroleum e xcise tax levied pursuant to 
Sections 1001, 1101 and 1102 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 
4.  Sales tax levied pursuant to Section 1354 of Title 68 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes; 
5.  Use tax levied pursuant to Section 1402 of Title 68 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes; 
6.  Income tax levied pursuant to Section 2355 of Title 68 of 
the Oklahoma Statutes ; and 
7.  Withholding tax levied p ursuant to Section 2385.2 of Title 
68 of the Oklahoma Statutes . 
D.  To be eligible to participate in this initiative, taxpayers 
must: 
1. Not have collected taxes from others, such as sales and use 
taxes or payroll taxes, and not reported those taxes; and 
2.  Not have, within the preceding three (3) year s, entered into 
a voluntary disclosure agreement fo r the type of tax owed. 
E.  If the Tax Commission agrees with the propos ed terms for 
payment of the principal amount of tax due and owing, the penalties 
and interest otherwise imposed by law upon the princ ipal amount 
shall be waived by operation of law and no further action by the Tax 
Commission or by the taxpayer shall be required for the waiver o f 
such penalty and applicable interest.   
 
Req. No. 10633 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  The Tax Commission shall limit the period for which 
additional taxes may be assessed to three (3) taxable years for 
annually filed taxes or thirty -six (36) months for taxes that do not 
have an annual filing frequency. 
G.  Taxpayers who meet all of the qualifications specifi ed in 
subsection D of this section, except those who have collected taxes 
from others, such as sales and use taxes or payroll taxes, and not 
reported those taxes, may enter into a modified volun tary disclosure 
agreement. 
H.  The provisions of a modified vo luntary disclosure agreement 
shall be the same as a voluntary disclosure agreement as specified 
in subsection E of this section; prov ided, the waiver of interest 
shall not apply except as may be optionally granted at the 
discretion of the Tax Commission, and the period for which taxes 
must be reported and remitted or assessed is extended beyond the 
three-year or thirty-six-month period provided in subsection F of 
this section to include all perio ds in which tax has been collected 
but not remitted. 
I.  The waiver of penalty and interest provided herein is fully 
effective provided taxpayer continues payment or collection and 
remittance of applicable taxes, as required by law, f or a period of 
one (1) year after the tax period(s) for which taxes were paid 
pursuant to this initiative.   
 
Req. No. 10633 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
J.  The Tax Commission is authorized to expend necessary 
available funds, inc luding contracting with third par ties, to 
publicly advertise, assist in the collection of elig ible taxes, and 
administer the Voluntary Disclosure Initiative and shall be exempt 
from the provisions of Secti on 85.7 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes for the purpose of implementing this se ction. 
K.  The Tax Commission is author ized to promulgate rules 
detailing the terms and other conditions of this program . 
L.  The provisions of this section shall not be applicable to 
any person appointed to or elected to a public office. 
M.  A taxpayer may utilize the procedures described by this 
section notwithstanding the provisions of Section 216.5 of Title 68 
of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
 
59-2-10633 JM 02/29/24