Req. No. 8281 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 59th Legi slature (2023) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO. 1063 By: Garvin of the Senate and Lawson of the House COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE [ income tax - credit - report - effective date ] BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2357.231 of Title 68, unless there is created a duplication in number ing, reads as follows: A. As used in this section: 1. "Child" means an individual who is five (5) years of age or less; 2. "Child care and education prov ider" means a person who owns or operates an eligibl e program; 3. "Child care expense" means the cost of locating safe and dependable services for th e care of a minor child of an employee; Req. No. 8281 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 4. "Eligible program" means an applicable child care and early childhood education program that has applied to participate in the quality rating and improvement syst em and has been assigned a quality scale rating; 5. "Eligible staff member" means an individual who is employed with, or who is a self-employed individual providing child care and early childhood education for, an eligible program for at least six (6) months of the taxable year. Eligible staff member does not include certificated teaching and administrative staff employed by programs established pursuant to applicable provisions of law; 6. "Employee" means a person to whom wages or other compensation is paid by an employer; 7. "Employer" means any sole proprietor or lawfully recognized business entity engaged in lawful business activity; 8. "Licensed child care facility" means a person or entity lawfully authorized to provide child care services within the state and which is enrolled in Oklahoma's Quality Rating and Improvement System (QRIS); 9. "Qualified child care worker" means a person employed for at least eight (8) consecutive months during the calen dar year corresponding to the income tax year fo r which the credit authorized by this section is claimed and who performs classroom services for a licensed child care facility and who is enrolled in O klahoma's Professional Development Ladder (PDL); and Req. No. 8281 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 10. "Quality scale rating" means the rating of an e ligible program under which the rating is expressed in terms of stars. B. For taxable years be ginning on or after January 1, 2024, and ending not later tha n December 31, 2028, subject to the limitations prescribed by this subsection and subsection D of this section, there shall be allowed as a credit against the tax imposed pursuant to Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes, an amount equal to: 1. Thirty percent (30%) of the amount expended by an e mployer for assistance provided by the employer to an employee for the employee's direct expenses of child car e; 2. Thirty percent (30%) of the amount expended by an employer for the cost of operating a child care facility primarily used by dependents of the employees of such empl oyer, excluding any payments made by the parent or guardian of such dependent such as tuition or fees; 3. Fifty percent (50%) of the amount expended by the employer to construct, either through new construction or rehabilitation of a structure, located not more than two (2) miles from the site at which employees perform primary work duties unless working remotely, to provide child care services to the children of th e employees; or 4. Fifty percent (5 0%) of the amount expended by the employer to establish, construct, acquire or develop a child care facility in conjunction with one or more other entities, whether for -profit Req. No. 8281 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 business entities, nonprofit entities or other lawfully organized entities, to provide child care services. C. The total credit amount which may be claimed by an employer pursuant to the provisions of this section shall not exceed: 1. Thirty Thousand Dollars ($30,000.00) for credits claimed pursuant to paragraph 1 or 2 of subsection B of this section for any taxable year; or 2. Forty-five Thousand Dollars ($45,000.00) for credits claimed pursuant to paragraph 3 or 4 of subsection B of this section for any taxable year. D. The credits authorized pursuant to the provisions of this section shall not be used to red uce the income tax liability of the taxpayer to less than zero (0). E. To the extent not used the credits authorized by this section may be carrie d over, in order, to each of the succeeding five (5) tax years. F. For the tax year beginning January 1, 2026, and each tax year thereafter, the total amou nt of credits authorized by this section used to offset tax sha ll be adjusted annually to limit the annual amount of credits to Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00). The Tax Commission shall annually calculate and publish by the first day of the affected y ear a percentage by which the credits authorized by this sectio n shall be reduced so the total amount of credits used to offset tax does not exceed Five Million Doll ars Req. No. 8281 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ($5,000,000.00) per year. The formula to be used for the percentage adjustment shall be Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the second preceding year. G. In the event the total tax credits authorized by this section exceed Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00) in any calendar year, the Tax Commission shall p ermit any excess over Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00) bu t shall factor such excess into the percentage adjustment formula for subsequent years. H. The provisions of this section shall cease to have the force and effect of law on January 1, 20 29. SECTION 2. NEW LAW A new section of law t o be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2357.232 of Title 68, unless there is created a duplication in numberin g, reads as follows: A. As used in this section: 1. "Child" means a person less than five (5) years of age; 2. "Licensed child care facility" means a person or entity lawfully authorized to provide child care servic es within the state and which is enrolled in Oklaho ma's Quality Rating and I mprovement System (QRIS); and 3. "Qualified child care worker" means a person employed for at least eight (8) consecutive months during the calendar year corresponding to the income tax year for which the credit authorized by this section is claimed and who performs classroom services for a licensed child care facility and who is enrolled in Oklahoma 's Req. No. 8281 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Professional Development Ladder (PDL) and has earned a minimum of twelve (12) credit hours. B. For taxable years beginning January 1, 2024, and ending not later than December 31, 2028, there shall be allowed a credit against the tax imposed pursuant to Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes in the amount of Five Hundred Dollars ($500.00) for a qualified child care worker. C. The credit authorized by this section shall be refundable. The credit shall first be applied to income tax liability , if any, for the income tax year for which the credit is clai med and the balance shall be refunded to the taxpayer. D. For the tax year beginning January 1, 2026, and each tax year thereafter, the total amount of credits authorized by this section used to offset tax shall be adjuste d annually to limit the annual amount of credits to Seven Million Dollars ($7,000,000.00). The Tax Commission shall annually calculate and publish by the first day of the affected year a percentage by which the credits authorized by this section shall be r educed so the total amount of credits used to offset tax does not exceed Seven Million Dollars ($7,000,000.00) per year. The formula to be used for the percentage adjustment shall be Seven Million Dollars ($7,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in t he second preceding year. E. In the event the total tax credits authorized by this section exceed Seven Million Dollars ($7,000,000.00) in any calendar Req. No. 8281 Page 7 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 year, the Tax Commission shall permit any excess over Seven Million Dollars ($7,000,000.00) but shall fa ctor such excess into the percentage adjustment formula for subsequent years. F. The provisions of this section shall cease to have the force and effect of law on January 1, 2029. SECTION 3. This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 59-1-8281 MKS 04/19/23