Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1141 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/20/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1757 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 1141 	By: Thompson (Roger) and Hall 
of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to appropriations; making an 
appropriation to the Department of Mental Health and 
Substance Abuse Services ; stating purpose; providing 
lapse dates; requiring an d prohibiting certain budget 
procedures; and declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  There is hereby appropriated to the Department of 
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services from any monies not 
otherwise appropriated from the General Revenue Fund of the State 
Treasury for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, the sum of One 
Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00 ) or so much thereof as may be 
necessary to perform the duties imposed upon the Department of 
Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services by law. 
SECTION 2.  Appropriations made by this act , not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budget ed for   
 
 
Req. No. 1757 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY -24), or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (here after FY-25).  
Funds budgeted for FY -24 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2024, and must be expended by November 15, 2024.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2024, and not budgeted for FY -25, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -25 may be encumbered only through Jun e 
30, 2025.  Any funds remaining after Nov ember 15, 2025, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Fun ds budgeted in FY-24 and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -25, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-24 budget work program and after suc h revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is her eby 
declared to exist, by reason whe reof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-1757 WR 2/20/2023 11:15:34 AM