Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1155 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/28/2024

                     
 
SB1155 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1155 	By: Hall and Rosino of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Caldwell (Trey) 
of the House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Historical Society; 
creating the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture 
Supplemental Revolving Fund; provid ing source of 
funds; providing for expenditures; requiring certain 
determination by the State Treasurer; requiring 
transfer of funds if certain determi nation is not 
made by certain date; directing transfer of funds; 
providing for codification; providing an effective 
date; and declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A ne w section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2294.1 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
There is hereby created in the State Treasury a revolving fund 
for the Oklahoma Historical Society , to be designated the “Oklahoma 
Museum of Popular Culture Supplemental Revolving Fund ”.  The fund 
shall be a continuing fund, not subject to fiscal year limitations,   
 
SB1155 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
and shall consist of all monies received by the Oklahoma Historical 
Society from appropri ations of the Legislature designated for 
deposit in this fund.  All monies accruing to the credit of the fund 
are hereby appropriated and shall be budgeted and expended to 
provide funding for repairs, planning, staging, refurbishments, and 
improvements to real and personal property, and funding for 
construction of the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture.  No 
expenditures shall be made from the fund unti l the State Treasurer 
determines that funds provided by local and county governments, the 
federal government, or through monetary donations in the amount of 
Eighteen Million Dollars ($18,000,000.00) are made for repairs, 
planning, staging, refurbishments, and improvements to real and 
personal property, and funding for construction of the Oklahoma 
Museum of Popular Culture; provided, no funds collected or received 
prior to May 25, 2023, shall be counted toward the amount.  
Expenditures from the fund shall be made upon warrants issued by the 
State Treasurer against claims filed as prescribed by law with the 
Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services for 
approval and payment.  On November 15, 2025, i f no determination is 
made by the State Treasurer pursuant to the provisions of this 
section authorizing expenditures from this fund, all unencumbered 
funds remaining in the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture 
Supplemental Revolving Fund shall be transferre d to the State   
 
SB1155 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Treasurer for deposit in the General Revenue Fund of the State 
Treasury for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024. 
SECTION 2.  The Director of the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services shall transfer on the effective da te of this act 
the sum of Eighteen Million Dollars ($18,000,000.00) of the funds 
appropriated to the Oklahoma Historical Society pursuant to Section 
106 of Enrolled House Bill No. 1004 of the 1st Extraordinary Session 
of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature to th e Oklahoma Museum of Popular 
Culture Supplemental Revolving Fund created in Section 1 of this 
act. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become ef fective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 4.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from an d after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON JOINT COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
AND BUDGET, dated 05/27/2024 - DO PASS, As Amended.