Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1160 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/20/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1826 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 1160 	By: Thompson (Roger) and Hall 
of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to appropriations; making an 
appropriation to the Oklahoma Department of Commerce; 
stating purpose; providing lapse dates; requiring an d 
prohibiting certain budget procedures; and declaring 
an emergency. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  There is hereby appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Commerce from any monies not otherwise appropriated 
from the General Revenue Fund of the State Treasu ry for the fiscal 
year ending June 30, 2024, th e sum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($100,000.00) or so much thereof as may be necessary to perform the 
duties imposed upon the Oklahoma Department of Commerce by law. 
SECTION 2.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budge ted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY -24), or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025 (hereafter F Y-25).    
 
 
Req. No. 1826 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Funds budgeted for FY -24 may be encumbered only through June 3 0, 
2024, and must be expended by November 15, 2024 . Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2024, and not budgeted for FY -25, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then cu rrent fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-25 may be encumbered only th rough June 
30, 2025.  Any funds remaining after No vember 15, 2025, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgete d in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -24 and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year , may be budgeted for FY -25, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-24 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Offic e of Management and Enterprise Services. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emerg ency is hereby 
declared to exist, by r eason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-1826 JC 2/20/2023 11:30:48 AM