Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1230 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/07/2023

                     
 
Req. No. 2305 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
SENATE BILL 1230 	By: Bergstrom 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to amusements and sports; amending 3A 
O.S. 2021, Section 604.1, which relates to the 
Oklahoma State Athletic Commissi on; extending sunset 
date; providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     3A O.S. 2021, Section 604.1, is 
amended to read as follow s: 
Section 604.1. A.  There is hereby re-created, until July 1, 
2024 July 1, 2027, in accordance with the Oklahoma Sunset Law, the 
Oklahoma State Athletic Commission, w hich shall be composed of nine 
(9) members appointed by the Governor with the advice an d consent of 
the Senate.  The member of the Commission initially appointed 
pursuant to this act shall serve a term of three (3) years that 
shall expire on June 30, 2006 . Members appointed to the Commission 
shall serve for terms of three (3) years .  Terms of office shall 
expire on June 30.  All vacancies and unexpired terms shall be 
filled in the same manner as the original appointment and within   
 
Req. No. 2305 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
sixty (60) days from the date of the vacancy.  Members may be 
removed by the Governor for incompetence, willful neglect of duty, 
corruption in office, or malfeasance in office. 
B.  Members appointed to the Commission shall reside in this 
state and shall have the following qualific ations: 
1.  Two members shall have ex perience as a professional 
combative sports practi tioner, other than as a professional wre stler 
or in professional combative spor ts promotions; 
2.  One member shall have experience as a professional wrestler 
or in professional wrestling promotions; 
3.  One member shall have experience in sports medicine; 
4.  One member shall have experience in the cable television 
business; and 
5.  Four members shall represent the public at large as lay 
members. 
C.  No member of the Comm ission or any person related to a 
member within the third degree by consanguinity or af finity shall 
promote, sponsor, or h ave any financial interest in the promotion or 
sponsorship of any professional combative sports event or amateur 
mixed martial arts ev ent while a member of the Commission. 
D.  The members of the Commission shall elect fro m their 
membership a chair and vic e-chair to serve for one -year terms.  A 
majority of the members shall constitute a quorum for the purpose of 
conducting the business of the Commission.  The Commission shall   
 
Req. No. 2305 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
meet at least quarterly, and special meetings ma y be called by the 
chair. 
E.  The Commission shall comply with the provisions o f the 
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act, the Oklahoma Open Records Act, and the 
Administrative Procedures Act. 
F.  All members of the C ommission and such employees as 
determined by the Commission shall be bonded as re quired by Sections 
85.58Q through 85.58V of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
G.  Members of the Commission shall serve without compensa tion 
but shall be reimbursed for expe nses incurred in the performance of 
their duties as provided in the State Travel Reimbursement Act. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediat ely necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-2-2305 RD 12/7/2023 9:23:46 AM