Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1230 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/08/2024

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1230 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 7, 2024 
 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 1230 	By: Bergstrom of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Kendrix of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to amusements and sports; amending 3A 
O.S. 2021, Section 604.1, which relates to the 
Oklahoma State Athletic Commi ssion; extending sunset 
date; providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     3A O.S. 2021, Section 604.1, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 604.1. A.  There is hereby re-created, until July 1, 
2024 July 1, 2027, in accordance with the Oklahoma Sunset Law, the 
Oklahoma State Athletic Commission, w hich shall be composed of nine 
(9) members appointed by the Governor with the advice and con sent of 
the Senate.  The member of the Commission initially appointed 
pursuant to this act shall serve a term of three (3) years that 
shall expire on June 30, 2006 . Members appointed to the Commission 
shall serve for terms of three (3) years .  Terms of office shall 
expire on June 30.  All vacancies and unexpired terms shall be   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1230 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
filled in the same manner as the original appointment and within 
sixty (60) days from the date of the vacancy.  Members may be 
removed by the Governor for incompetence, willful negle ct of duty, 
corruption in office, or malfeasance in office. 
B.  Members appointed to t he Commission shall reside in this 
state and shall have the following qualific ations: 
1.  Two members shall have ex perience as a professional 
combative sports practitione r, other than as a professional wre stler 
or in professional combative sports promotions; 
2.  One member shall have experience as a professional wrestler 
or in professional wrestling promotions; 
3.  One member shall have experience in sports medicine; 
4.  One member shall have experience in the cable television 
business; and 
5.  Four members shall represent the public at large as lay 
members. 
C.  No member of the Comm ission or any person related to a 
member within the third degree by consanguinity or affinit y shall 
promote, sponsor, or h ave any financial interest in the promotion or 
sponsorship of any professional combative sports event or amateur 
mixed martial arts ev ent while a member of the Commission. 
D.  The members of the Commission shall elect from the ir 
membership a chair and vic e-chair to serve for one -year terms.  A 
majority of the members shall constitute a quorum for the purpose of   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1230 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
conducting the business of the Commission.  The Commission shall 
meet at least quarterly, and special meetings may be called by the 
chair. 
E.  The Commission shall comply with the provisions of the 
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act, the Oklahoma Open Records Act, and the 
Administrative Procedures Act. 
F.  All members of the C ommission and such employees as 
determined by the Commi ssion shall be bonded as re quired by Sections 
85.58Q through 85.58V of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
G.  Members of the Commission shall serve without compensa tion 
but shall be reimbursed for expe nses incurred in the performance of 
their duties as provided in the State Travel Reimbursement Act. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediat ely necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is he reby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ADMINISTRATIVE RULES 
February 7, 2024 - DO PASS