Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1231 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2024

                     
 
SB1231 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1231 	By: Bergstrom of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Kendrix of the House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to professions and occupations; 
amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 137, which relates to 
the Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners; extending 
sunset date; updating statutory reference; providing 
an effective date; and declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2021, Section 137, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 137.  A.  A Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners is 
hereby re-created, to continue until July 1, 2024 July 1, 2027, in 
accordance with the pro visions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law.  Said The 
Board shall regulate the practice of podiatric medicine in this 
state in accordance with the provisions of the Podiatric Medicine 
Practice Act.  The B oard, appointed by the Governor, shall be 
composed of five podiatric physicians licensed to practice podiatric 
medicine in this state and one lay member representing the public.   
 
SB1231 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  Each podiatric physician member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; 
2.  Have practiced podiatric medicine conti nuously in this state 
during the three (3) years immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board; 
3.  Be free of pending disciplinary action or active 
investigation by the Board; and 
4.  Be a member in good standing of the American Podiatric 
Medical Association and of the Oklahoma Podiatric Medical 
Association. 
C.  The lay member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be related, within the third degree of cons anguinity 
or affinity, to any such person; and 
3.  Participate in Board proceedings only for the purposes of: 
a. reviewing, investigating and disposing of written 
complaints regarding the conduct of podiatric 
physicians, and 
b. formulating, adopting and pr omulgating rules pursuant 
to Article I of the Administrative Procedures Act. 
D.  Except as provided in su bsection E of this section, the term 
of office of each podiatric physician member of the Board shall be 
five (5) years, with one such member being appo inted to the Board   
 
SB1231 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
each year.  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of th e Governor.  Each member shall hold 
office until the expiration of the term for which appoi nted or until 
a qualified successor has been duly appointed.  An appointment shall 
be made by the Governor within ninety (90) days after the expiration 
of the term of any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the 
Board due to resignation, death, or any other cause resulting in an 
unexpired term.  The appointmen t of the podiatric physician members 
shall be made from a list of not less than five persons submitted 
annually to the Governor by the Oklahoma Podiatric Medical 
Association. 
E.  Each of the three podiatric physician members of the Board, 
serving on the effective date of this act September 1,1993, shall 
complete the term of office for which he or she was appo inted, and 
the successor to each such member shall be appointed for a term of 
five (5) years.  Within sixty (60) days after the effective date of 
this act September 1, 1993, the Governor shall appoint two new 
podiatric physician members to the Board, one f or a term expiring 
July 1, 1997, and one for a term expiring on July 1, 1998.  The 
successor to each such new member shall be appointed for a term of 
five (5) years. 
F.  Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of   
 
SB1231 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in said such article. 
G.  A member may be removed from the Board by the Governor for 
cause which shall include, but no t be limited to: 
1.  Ceasing to be qualified; 
2.  Being found guilty by a court of competen t jurisdiction of a 
felony or of any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in re lation to Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally incompetent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision of the Podiatric 
Medicine Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three consecutive meetings of the Board 
without just cause, as determined by the Board. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereb y 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: C OMMITTEE ON ADMINISTRATIVE RULES, dated 
03/28/2024 - DO PASS.