Req. No. 3551 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR SENATE BILL 1272 By: McCortney of the Senate and Sneed of the House COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act; amending 74 O.S. 2 021, Section 1312, which relates to the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund ; defining term; establishing maximum amount to be deposited into fund; requiring approval by Oklahoma Employees I nsurance and Benefits Board for certain administrative changes; directing use of certain excess funds pursuant to certain schedule; requiring notification of certain information to enrollees; requiring reporting; providing contents o f report; updating statutory language; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 74 O.S. 2021, Section 1312, is amended to read as follows: Section 1312. (1) A. Except as otherwise provided by law, all employee and employer contributions, appropriations and dividend payments related to the health and dental plans administered by the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services (OMES) Req. No. 3551 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 shall be deposited in a fund in the State Treasury which is hereby created and which shall be known as the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund “Health and Dental Ins urance Reserve Fund”. The money in such fund shall be invested by the Oklahoma Employees I nsurance and Benefits Board in the manner specified in Section 1305.1 of this title. Investment income of the fund shall be added to the fund. Money payable to the claims administrator and all expenses in connection with the plans shall be paid from the fund. The Board shall have responsibility for management of the fund. (2) B. All monies in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund that are reserves for the life insurance plan a dministered by the Office OMES shall be transferred to the Life Insurance Reser ve Fund on July 1, 1989. C. 1. For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and each fiscal year thereafter, OMES shall maintain and record the internal benchmark for funds necessary to operate the stat e-administered plans to be held in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund. 2. For the purposes of this section, “internal benchmark” means the National Association of Insurance Commissioners recommended calculation for risk-based capital plus the previous ten (10) years’ average for claims and investment losses. D. 1. Any funds in excess of the limitations set forth in subsection C of this section shall be spent to lower premiums and health insurance costs pursuant to the schedule prescribed in Req. No. 3551 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 paragraph 2 of this subsection. A clear and concise statement of how cost savings are implemented for the plan year shall be provided to all enrollees. 2. Funds in excess of the internal benchma rk shall be spent in accordance with paragraph 1 of this s ubsection pursuant to the following schedule: a. for the plan year beginning Jan uary 1, 2025, twenty percent (20%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, b. for the plan year beginning January 1, 202 6, forty percent (40%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, c. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2027, sixty percent (60%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, d. for the plan year beginning Janu ary 1, 2028, eighty percent (80%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark, and e. for the plan year beginning January 1 , 2029, and each plan year thereafter , one hundred percent (100%) of the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark. E. Beginning January 1, 2026, and each year thereafter, OMES shall electronically issue an annual report to the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, Req. No. 3551 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 and the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Board not later than July 1 containing the following information regarding all state-administered plans: 1. Reserve amounts for the previous five (5) fiscal years; 2. Current operating expenses; 3. Premium rates for enrollees of each pla n for the previous five (5) plan years; 4. An explanation of all premium de creases, increases, and cost savings realized by enrollees for the current plan year; and 5. Any other information deem ed necessary by the Board. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1 , 2024. SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage an d approval. 59-2-3551 RD 2/28/2024 6:37:50 PM