Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1272 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/18/2024

                     
 
ENGR. H. A. to ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE AMENDME NT 
 TO 
ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO . 1272 By: McCortney of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Sneed of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
[ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act - 
Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting - 
effective date -  
 	emergency ] 
 
 
 
 
AMENDMENT NO. 1.  Page 1, line 10, strike the enacting clause 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 17th day of April, 2024. 
 
 
 
 
  
Presiding Officer of the House of 
 	Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ____ day of _______ ___, 2024. 
 
 
 
 
  
Presiding Officer of the Senate 
   
 
ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1272 	By: McCortney of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Sneed of the House 
 
 
 
 
[ Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Act - 
Reserve Fund - approval - notification - reporting - 
effective date -  
 	emergency ] 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOP LE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021, Section 1312, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 1312.  (1) A. Except as otherwise provided by law, all 
employee and employer cont ributions, appropriations and dividend 
payments related to the health and dental plans administered by the 
Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services (OMES) 
shall be deposited in a fund in the State Treasury which is hereby 
created and which shall be known as the Health and Dental Insurance 
Reserve Fund “Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund ”.  The money 
in such fund shall be invested by the Oklahoma Employees Insurance 
and Benefits Board in the manner specified in Section 1305.1 of thi s 
title.  Investment income of the fund shall be added to the fund.  
Money payable to the claims administrator and all expenses in   
 
ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
connection with the plans shall be paid from the fund.  The Board 
shall have responsibility for management of the fund. 
(2) B. All monies in the Health an d Dental Insurance Reserve 
Fund that are reserves for the life insurance plan administered by 
the Office OMES shall be transferred to the Life Insurance Reserve 
Fund on July 1, 1989. 
C.  1.  For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and each 
fiscal year thereafter, OMES shall maintain and record the internal 
benchmark for funds necessary to operate the state -administered 
plans to be held in the Health and Dental Insurance Reserve Fund. 
2.  For the purposes of this section, “internal benchmark” means 
the National Association of Insurance Commissioners recommended 
calculation for risk -based capital plus the previous ten (10) years ’ 
average for claims and investment losses. 
D. 1.  Any funds in excess of the limitations set forth i n 
subsection C of this section shall be spent to lower premiums and 
health insurance costs pursuant to the schedule prescribed in 
paragraph 2 of this subsection .  A clear and concise statement of 
how cost savings are implemented for the plan year shall be provided 
to all enrollees. 
2.  Funds in excess of the internal benchmark shall be spent in 
accordance with paragraph 1 of this subsection pursuant to the 
following schedule:   
 
ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
a. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2025, twenty 
percent (20%) of the monies exceeding the reported 
internal benchmark, 
b. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2026, forty 
percent (40%) of the monies exceeding the reported 
internal benchmark, 
c. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2027, sixty 
percent (60%) of the monies excee ding the reported 
internal benchmark, 
d. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2028, eighty 
percent (80%) of the monies exceeding the reported 
internal benchmark, and 
e. for the plan year beginning January 1, 2029, and each 
plan year thereafter, one hundr ed percent (100%) of 
the monies exceeding the reported internal benchmark. 
E.  Beginning January 1, 2026, and each year thereafter, OMES 
shall electronically issue an annual report to the President Pro 
Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Rep resentatives, 
and the Oklahoma Employees Insurance and Benefits Board not later 
than July 1 containing the following information regarding all 
state-administered plans: 
1.  Reserve amounts for the previous five (5) fiscal years; 
2.  Current operating expen ses;   
 
ENGR. S. B. NO. 1272 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Premium rates for enr ollees of each plan for the previous 
five (5) plan years; 
4.  An explanation of all premium decreases, increases, and cost 
savings realized by enrollees for the current plan year ; and 
5.  Any other information deemed necessary by the Board. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2024. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by rea son whereof this act shall tak e effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
Passed the Senate the 1 4th day of March, 2024. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the ____ day of __________, 
2024. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives