Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1299 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/12/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 2470 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
SENATE BILL 1299 	By: Rader 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to income tax credit; amending 68 
O.S. 2021, Section 2357.104, as amended by Section 1, 
Chapter 33, 1st Extraordinary Ses sion, O.S.L. 2023 
(68 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 2357.104), which relates 
to credit for certain railroad e xpenditures; making 
credit refundable for certain tax years ; requiring 
submission of documentation to the Department of 
Transportation for credit eligibility; and providing 
an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPL E OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.104, as 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 33, 1st Extraordinary Session, O.S.L . 
2023 (68 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 2357.104), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 2357.104. A.  Except as otherwise provided by this 
section, for taxable y ears beginning after December 31, 2005, and 
ending before January 1, 2030, there shall be allowed a credit 
against the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this t itle equal to fifty 
percent (50%) of an eligible taxpayer ’s qualified railroad 
reconstruction or replacement expenditures.   
 
 
Req. No. 2470 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  For tax years 2020 th rough 2029, the amount of the credit 
shall be limited to the product of Five Thousand Dollars ($5,000. 00) 
and the number of miles of railroad track owned or leased within 
this state by the eligible taxpayer a s of the close of the taxable 
year. 
C.  The For tax years 2006 through 202 4, the credit allowed 
pursuant to subsection A of this sec tion but not used shall be 
freely transferable, by written agreement, to subsequent transferees 
at any time during the five (5) ye ars following the year of 
qualification.  An eligible transferee shall be any taxpayer subject 
to the tax imposed by Section 2 355 of this title.  The person 
originally allowed the credit and the subsequent transferee shall 
jointly file a copy of the written credit transfer agreement with 
the Oklahoma Tax Commission within thirty (30) days of the transfer.  
The written agreement s hall contain the name, address, and taxpayer 
identification number of the parties to the transfer, the amount of 
credit being transferred, the year the credit was originally allowed 
to the transferring per son, and the tax year or years for which the 
credit may be claimed. The Tax Commission shall promulgate ru les to 
permit verification of the timeliness of a tax credit claimed upon a 
tax return pursuant to this subsection but shall not promulgate any 
rules which unduly restrict or hinder the transfers of suc h tax 
credit.  The Department of Transportation shall promulgate rules to 
permit verification of the eligibility of an eligible ta xpayer’s   
 
 
Req. No. 2470 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
expenditures for the purpose of claiming the credit.  The rules 
shall provide for the approval of qualified railroad reconstruction 
or replacement expenditures prior to co mmencement of a project and 
provide a certificate of verification up on completion of a project 
that uses qualified railroad reconstruction or replacem ent 
expenditures.  The certificate of verification s hall satisfy all 
requirements of the Tax Commission pertaining to the eligibility of 
the person claiming the credit. 
D.  Any For tax years 2006 through 2024, credits allowed 
pursuant to the provisions of subsection A o f this section but not 
used in any tax year may be carried over in orde r to each of the 
five (5) years following the year of qualification. For tax year 
2025 and subsequent tax years, if the credit exceeds the tax imposed 
by Section 2355 of this title, th e excess amount shall be refunded 
to the taxpayer. 
E.  As used in this section: 
1.  “Class II and Class III rail road” means a railroad that is 
classified by the United States Surface Tra nsportation Board as a 
Class II or Class III railroa d; 
2.  “Eligible taxpayer” means any Class II or C lass III 
railroad; and 
3.  “Qualified railroad reconstruction or replacement 
expenditures” means expenditures for:   
 
 
Req. No. 2470 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
a. track maintenance, natural disasters , and 
reconstruction or replacement of railroad 
infrastructure including track, roadbed, crossings, 
bridges, industrial leads, and track-related 
structures owned or leased by a Class II or Class III 
railroad as of January 1, 2006, or 
b. new construction of industrial leads, switches, spurs, 
and sidings and extensions of existing sidings by a 
Class II or Class III railroad. 
F.  The total amount of credits authorized by this section used 
to offset tax shall be adjusted annually to li mit the annual amount 
of credits to Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) for tax years 2018 
and 2019 and Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00) for tax year 2020 
and all subsequent tax years.  The Tax Commission s hall annually 
calculate and publish a percentage by which the credits auth orized 
by this section shall be reduced so the total amount of credits used 
to offset tax does not exceed the applicable annual limit.  The 
formula to be used for the percentage adju stment shall be the 
applicable annual limit di vided by the credits claimed in the second 
preceding year. 
G.  Pursuant to subse ction F of this section, in the event the 
total tax credits authorized by this section exceed the annual 
applicable limit in any c alendar year, the Tax Commission shall 
permit any excess over the annual a pplicable limit but shall factor   
 
 
Req. No. 2470 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
such excess into the percentage adjustment formula for subsequent 
years. 
H.  For tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, to be eligible 
to claim the credit provided in this section, the taxpayer shall 
submit documentation to the Department of Transportation which shall 
include the following : 
1.  The name of the entity; 
2.  Total project expenditures related to the rec onstruction or 
replacement; and 
3.  Whether the construction project was completed as part of a 
broader economic development project, including any partnership with 
local government entities or economic development organizations. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
 
59-2-2470 QD 12/12/2023 5:51:05 PM