Req. No. 2543 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) SENATE BILL 1497 By: Garvin AS INTRODUCED An Act relating to income tax credit; amending 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.45, which relates to credit for donations to certain research institutes; modifying credit limit for ce rtain institute in certain tax years; modifying credit limit for taxpayer in certain tax years; modifying definition; updating statutory reference; updating statutory language; and providing an effective date . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.45, is amended to read as follows: Section 2357.45. A. 1. For tax years beginning after December 31, 2004, there shal l be allowed against the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title, a credit for any taxpayer who makes a donation to an independent biomedical research institute and for tax years beginning after December 31, 2010, a credit fo r any taxpayer who makes a donation to a cancer research institute . 2. The credit authorized by paragraph 1 of this subsection shall be limited as follows: Req. No. 2543 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 a. for calendar year 2007 and all subsequen t years tax years 2007 through 2024, the credit percentage, not to exceed fifty percent (50%), shall be adjusted annually so that the total estimate of the credits does not exceed Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) annually. The formula to be used for the percentage adjusted shall be fifty percent (50%) times One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the preceding year for each donation to an independent biomedical research institu te and fifty percent (50%) times One Million Do llars ($1,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the preceding year for each donation to a cancer research institute, b. for tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, the credit percentage, not to exceed fifty percent (50%), shall be adjusted annually so that the total estimate of the credits does not exce ed Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) annually for donations to indepen dent biomedical research institut es. The formula to be used for the percentage adjusted shall be fifty percent (50%) times Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the preceding year for each donation to an independent biomedical research institute , Req. No. 2543 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 c. for tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, the credit percentage, not to exceed fifty percent (50%), shall be adjusted annually so that the total estimate of the credits does not exceed One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) annually for donations to cancer research institutes. The formula to be used for the percentage adjusted shall be fifty percent (50%) times One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the prec eding year for each donation to a cancer research institute, d. in no event shall a taxpayer claim more than one credit for a donation to any independent biomedical research institute and one credit for a d onation to a cancer research institute in each taxable year nor shall the credit exceed One Thousand Dollars ($1,000.00) for each taxpayer for tax years 2005 through 2024, and One Thousand Dollars ( $1,000.00) for single filers and married filing separate, Two Thousand Dollars ($2,000.00) for married filing joint, head of household, qualifying widow, and for any taxpayer that is a business entity formed under the laws of any state, including limited and general partnerships, corpor ations, and limited liabili ty companies, for tax year 2025 and sub sequent tax years, Req. No. 2543 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 for each type of the donation to a cancer research institute. For tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, the credit shall not exceed O ne Thousand Dollars ($1,000.00) for single filers and married filing separate, Two Thousand Dollars ($2,000.00) for married filing joint, head of household, and qualifying widow, and Fifty Thousand Dollars ($50,000.00) for any taxpayer that is a business entity formed under the laws of any state, including limited and general par tnerships, corporations, and limited liability companies for donations to any independent biomedical research instit ute, c. e. for tax year 2011, no more than Fifty Thousand Dollars ($50,000.00) in total tax credits for donations to a cancer research institute shall be allowed, d. f. in no event shall more than fifty percent (50%) of the Two Million Dollars ($ 2,000,000.00) in total tax credits authorized by this section, for any calendar year after the effective date of this act January 1, 2011, be allocated for credits for donations to a cancer research institute, and e. g. in the event the total tax credits authorized by this section exceed One Million Dollars Req. No. 2543 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ($1,000,000.00) in any calendar year for either a cancer research institute or One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) for tax years 2011 through 2024, and One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,500,000.00) for tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, for an independent biomedical research institute, the Oklahoma Tax Com mission shall permit any excess over One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) but shall factor such excess into the percentage adjustment formula for subsequent years for that type of donation. However, any such adjustment to the formula for donations to an independent biomedical research institute shall not affect the formu la for donations to a cancer research institute, and any such adjustment to the formula for donations to a cancer research institute shall not affect the formula for donations to an independ ent biomedical research institute. 3. For purposes of this section, “independent biomedical research institute” means an organization in this state which is exempt from taxation pursuant to the provisions of Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code, 26 U.S.C., Section 501(c)(3) whose primary focus is conducting pe er-reviewed basic biomedical research. The organization shall: Req. No. 2543 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 a. have a board of directors, b. be able to accept grants in its own name, c. be an identifiable institute that has its own employees and administrative st aff, and d. receive at least Fifteen Million Dollars ($15,000,000.00) Twenty Million Dollars ($20,000,000.00) in National Institute Institutes of Health funding each year. 4. For purposes of this section, “cancer research institute ” means an organization which is exempt from taxation pursuan t to the Internal Revenue Code and whose primary focus is raising the standard of cancer clinical care in Oklahoma through pee r-reviewed cancer research and education or a not -for-profit supporting organization, as that term is defined by the Internal Reve nue Code, affiliated with a tax-exempt organization whose primary focus is raising the standard of cancer clinical care in Oklahoma through peer-reviewed cancer research and education. The tax -exempt organization whose primary focus is raising the standar d of cancer clinical care in Oklahoma through peer -reviewed cancer research and education shall: a. either be an independent r esearch institute or a program that is part of a state university which is a member of The Oklahoma State System of Higher Education, and Req. No. 2543 Page 7 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 b. receive at least Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) in National Cancer Institute funding each year. B. In no event shall the amount of the credit exceed the amount of any tax liability of the taxpayer. C. Any credits allowed but not used in any tax year may be carried over, in order, to each of the four (4) years f ollowing the year of qualification. D. The Tax Commission shall have the authority to prescribe forms for purposes of claimin g the credit authorized by this section. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 59-2-2543 QD 12/15/2023 9:45:08 PM