Req. No. 3431 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR SENATE BILL 1497 By: Garvin COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to income tax credit; amending 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.45, which relates to credit for donations to certain research institutes; modifying credit limit for certain institute in certain tax years; modifying credit limit for taxpayer in certain tax years; modifying definition; updating statutory reference; updating statutory language; and providing an effective date . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.45, is amended to read as follows: Section 2357.45. A. 1. For tax years beginning aft er December 31, 2004, there shall be allowed against the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title, a credit for any taxpayer who makes a donation to an independent biomedical research institute and for tax years beginning after December 31, 2010, a credit for any taxpayer who makes a donation to a cancer research institute . 2. The credit authori zed by paragraph 1 of this subsection shall be limited as follows: Req. No. 3431 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 a. for calendar year 2007 and all subsequen t years tax years 2007 through 2024, the credit percentage, not to exceed fifty percent (50%), shall be adjusted annually so that the total estimate of the credits does not exceed Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) annually. The formula to be used for the percentage adjusted shall be fifty percent (50%) times One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the preceding year for each donation to an independent biomedical research institu te and fifty percent (50%) times One Million Do llars ($1,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the preceding year for each donation to a cancer research institute, b. for tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, the credit percentage, not to exceed fifty percent (50%), shall be adjusted annually so that the total estimate of the credits does not exceed One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,500,000.00) annually for donations to indepen dent biomedical research institutes. The formula to be used for the percentage adjusted shall be fifty pe rcent (50%) times One Million Five Hundred Thousand D ollars ($1,500,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the preceding year Req. No. 3431 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 for each donation to an independent biomedical research institute, c. for tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, the credit percentage, not to exceed fifty percent (50%), shall be adjusted annually so that the total estimate of the credits does not exceed One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) annually for donations t o cancer research institutes. The formula to be used for the percentage adjusted shall be fifty percent (50%) times One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) divided by the credits claimed in the preceding year for each donation to a cancer research institute, d. in no event shall a taxpayer claim more than one credit for a donation to any independent biomedical research institute and one credit for a d onation to a cancer research institute in each taxable year nor shall the credit exceed One Thousand Dollars ($1,000.00) for each taxpayer for tax years 2005 through 2024, and One Thousand Dollars ( $1,000.00) for single filers and married filing separate, Two Thousand Dollars ($2,000.00) for married filing join t, head of household, qualifying widow, and for any taxpayer that is a business entity formed under the laws of any state, including limited and general Req. No. 3431 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 partnerships, corpor ations, and limited liabili ty companies, for tax year 2025 and sub sequent tax years, for each type of the donation to a cancer research institute. For tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years, the credit shall not exceed O ne Thousand Dollars ($1,000.00) for single filers and marri ed filing separate, Two Thousand Dollars ($2,000.00) for married filing joint, head of household, and qualifying widow, and Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($25,000.00) for any taxpayer that is a business entity formed under the laws of any state, including limited and general par tnerships, corporations, and limited liability companies for donations to any independent biomedic al research institute, c. e. for tax year 2011, no more than Fifty Thousand Dollars ($50,000.00) in total tax credits for donations to a cancer research institute shall be allowed, d. f. in no event shall more than fifty percent (50%) of the Two Million Dollars ($ 2,000,000.00) in total tax credits authorized by this section, for any calendar year after the effective date of this act January 1, 2011, be allocated for credits for donatio ns to a cancer research institute, and Req. No. 3431 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 e. g. in the event the total tax c redits authorized by this section exceed One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) in any calendar year for either a cancer research institute or One Million Dollars ( $1,000,000.00) for tax years 2011 through 2024 , and One Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ( $1,500,000.00) for tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years for an independent biomedical research institute , the Oklahoma Tax Commission shall permit any exce ss over One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) but shall factor such excess into the percentage adjustment formula for subsequent years for that type of donation. However, any such adjustment to the formula for don ations to an independent biomedical research institute shall not affect the formula for donations to a cancer research institute, and any such adjustment to the formula for donations to a cancer resea rch institute shall not affect the formula for donations to an independent biomedical research insti tute. 3. For purposes of this section, “independent biomedical research institute” means an organization in this state which is exempt from taxation pursuant to the provisions of Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code, 26 U.S.C., Section 501(c)(3) whose Req. No. 3431 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 primary focus is conducting peer -reviewed basic biomedical research. The organization shall: a. have a board of directors, b. be able to accept grants in its own name, c. be an identifiable institute that has its own employees and administrative st aff, and d. receive at least Fifteen Million Dollars ($15,000,000.00) Twenty Million Dollars ($20,000,000.00) in National Institute Institutes of Health funding each year. 4. For purposes of this section, “cancer research institute ” means an organization which is exempt from taxation pursuant to the Internal Revenue Code and whose primary focus is raising the standard of cancer clinical care in Oklahoma through pee r-reviewed cancer research and education or a not -for-profit supporting organization, as that term is defined by the Internal Revenue Code, affiliated with a tax-exempt organization whose primary focus is raising the standard of cancer clinical care in Oklahoma through peer-reviewed cancer research and e ducation. The tax-exempt organization whose primary focus is raising the standard of cancer clinical care in Oklahoma through peer -reviewed cancer research and education shall: a. either be an independent r esearch institute or a program that is part of a state university which is a Req. No. 3431 Page 7 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 member of The Oklahoma State System of Higher Education, and b. receive at least Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) in National Cancer Institute funding each year. B. In no event shall the amount of the credit exceed the amou nt of any tax liability of the taxpayer. C. Any credits allowed but not used in any tax year may be carried over, in order, to each of the four (4) years f ollowing the year of qualification. D. The Tax Commission shall have the authority to prescribe forms for purposes of claimin g the credit authorized by this section. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 59-2-3431 QD 2/19/2024 4:07:36 PM