Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB435 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/17/2023

                     
 
 
Req. No. 628 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 435 	By: Montgomery 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to the Service Warranty A ct; amending 
15 O.S. 2021, Section 141.14, which relates to 
penalties, reports, and administ rative fees; 
modifying administrative fee amount; conforming 
language; amending 36 O.S. 2021, Section 307.3, which 
relates to the State Insurance Commissioner Re volving 
Fund; exempting certain fee from provisions of State 
Insurance Commissioner Rev olving Fund; and providing 
an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     15 O.S. 2021, Se ction 141.14, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 141.14.  A.  In addition to the li cense fees provided in 
the Service Warranty Act for service warranty associations each 
service warranty association and insurer shall annually, on or 
before the first day of May, file with the Insurance Co mmissioner 
its annual financial statement showing a ll gross written provid er 
fees or assessments received by it in connection with the issuance 
of service warranties in this state during the preceding calendar 
year and other relevant financial information as deemed necessary by   
 
 
Req. No. 628 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the Commissioner.  The finan cial statements require d by this 
subsection must be: 
1.  Audited and prepared in accordance with statutory accounting 
principles if the applicant complies with the requi rements of 
subsection A of Section 1 41.6 of this title; or 
2.  Verified under oath of a t least two of its prin cipal 
officers and prepared in accordance with generally accepted 
accounting principles if the applicant utilizes an insurance policy 
which satisfies the requirements of subsection B of Section 141.6 of 
this title. 
B.  The Commissioner may levy a fine of u p to One Hundred 
Dollars ($100.00) a day for each day an association neglects to file 
its financial statement in the form and within the time prov ided by 
the Service Warranty Act. 
C. In addition to the annual financial statements re quired to 
be filed by subsection A of this section, the Commissioner may 
require of licensees, under oath and in the form prescribed by it, 
quarterly statements or speci al reports which the Commissioner de ems 
necessary for the proper supervision of license es under the Service 
Warranty Act. 
D. Provider fees and assessments received by associations and 
insurers for service warranties shall not be subject to the premium 
tax provided in Section 624 of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes, 
but shall be subject to an administrative fee o f equal to two   
 
 
Req. No. 628 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
percent (2%) of the gross provider fee received on the sale of all 
service warranties issued in this state during the preceding 
calendar quarter.  The fees shall be pa id quarterly to the Insurance 
Commissioner.  Howeve r, licensed association s, licensed insurers and 
entities with applications for licensure as a service warranty 
association pending with the Department that have contract ual 
liability insurance in place as of March 31, 2009, from an insurer 
which satisfies the requirements of sub sections B and C of Section 
141.6 of this title and which covers one hundred percent (100%) of 
the claims exposure of the association or insurer o n all contracts 
written may elect to shall pay an annual administrative fee of Three 
Thousand Dollars ($3,000. 00) in lieu of the two-percent 
administrative fee Four Thousand Two Hundred Dollars ($4,200.00).  
The administrative fee set forth in this section shall not be 
subject to the provisi ons of Section 307.3 of Title 36 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes. 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     36 O.S. 2021, Section 307.3, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 307.3. A.  Effective July 1, 2009, there is hereby 
created in the State Treasury a revolving fund for the Insurance 
Commissioner called the State Insurance Commissioner Revolving Fund.  
The revolving fund shall be used to fund the operations of the 
Office of the Insurance Commissioner.   
 
 
Req. No. 628 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  Notwithstanding any other law to the contrary , the revolving 
fund shall consist of and consolida te all funds that are or have 
been paid or collected by the Insurance Comm issioner pursuant to the 
laws of this state and the rules of the Insurance Department except 
that the revolving fund shall not incl ude: 
a. premium taxes, 
b. monies transferred to the Attorney General’s Insurance 
Fraud Unit Revolving Fund pursuant to Sectio n 362 of 
this title, 
c. funds paid to and collected pursuant to the Oklahoma 
Certified Real Estate Appraisers Act, Sections 858 -700 
through 858-732 of Title 59 of the Oklahoma Statut es, 
d. health carrier access payments paid to and collected 
by the Insurance Commissioner and deposited into the 
Health Carrier Access Payment Revolving Fund, 
e. recoveries obtained as a result of insuranc e-related 
crimes, and other fines, late fees, and p enalties 
assessed and collected, and 
f. monies collected for or received from the Workers’ 
Compensation Commission , and 
g. administrative fees paid pursuant to subsection D of 
Section 141.14 of Title 15 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
2.  The revolving fund shal l be a continuing fund, not subject 
to fiscal year limitations.  Expenditures from the revolving fund   
 
 
Req. No. 628 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
shall be made pursuant to the laws of this state and the statutes 
relating to the Insurance Department. Warrants for expenditures 
from the revolving fund shall be drawn by the State Treasurer, based 
on claims signed by an authorized employee or employees of the 
Insurance Department and filed with the Director of the Off ice of 
Management and Enterprise Services. 
B.  All funds collected by the Insurance Comm issioner shall be 
paid into the State Treasury weekly. 
C.  After the effective date of this act, the State Treasury is 
authorized and directed to deduct from the funds paid or collected 
by the Insurance Commissioner a sum equal to seventy -six and one- 
half percent (76.5%) of the payment and place the same to the credit 
of the General Revenue Fund of the state.  The State Treasurer shall 
place to the credit of the State I nsurance Commissioner Revolving 
Fund the remainder of the funds so paid and collected by the 
Insurance Commissioner. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective January 1, 2024. 
 
59-1-628 RD 1/17/2023 9:26:54 AM