Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB60 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/10/2023

                     
 
SB60 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 60 	By: Daniels of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Kendrix of the House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to professions and occupations; 
amending 59 O.S. 2021, Section 161.4, which relates 
to the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; extending 
sunset date; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergenc y. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2021, Section 161.4, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 161.4. A.  A Board of Chiropractic Examiners is hereby 
re-created to continue until July 1, 2023 2026, in accordance with 
the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law.  The Board shall regulate 
the practice of chiropractic in this state in accordance with the 
provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act.  The Board, 
appointed by the Governor, shall be composed of eight chiropractic 
physicians and one lay member representing the public. 
B.  Each chiropractic physician m ember of the Board shall:   
 
SB60 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; 
2.  Have practiced chiropractic continuously in this state 
during the five (5) y ears immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board; 
3.  Be free of pending disciplinary action or active 
investigation by the Board; 
4.  Be a person of recognized professional ability, integrity 
and good reputation; and 
5.  Be in active clinical chiroprac tic practice at least fifty 
percent (50%) of the time. 
C.  The lay member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; and 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be related within the third degree of co nsanguinity 
or affinity to any such person. 
D.  The Governor shal l appoint members to the Board and for 
terms of years as follows: 
1.  Position 1:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 2, 2006, the Governor shall appo int a 
board member from District 1 for a term of four (4) years t o expire 
on November 1, 2010, and every four ( 4) years thereafter; 
2.  Position 2:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2005, the Governor shall app oint a   
 
SB60 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
board member from District 2 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
3.  Position 3:  Upo n expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2007, the Governor shall appoin t a board 
member from District 3 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2011, and every four (4) yea rs thereafter; 
4.  Position 4:  Upon expir ation of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 4 for a term of four (4) years to exp ire 
on November 1, 2011, and every four (4) ye ars thereafter; 
5.  Position 5:  Upon expi ration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2008, the Governor shall appoint a bo ard 
member from District 5 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2012, and every four (4) years the reafter; 
6.  Position 6:  On June 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 6 for a term of one (1) year to expire on 
June 1, 2006, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
7.  Position 7:  On November 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint 
a board member from District 7 for a term of three (3) years to 
expire on November 1, 2008, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
8.  Position 8: Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from the state at large for a term of four (4) years to 
expire on June 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter; and   
 
SB60 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
9.  Position 9:  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor. 
E.  For the purpose of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Ac t, 
the state shall be divided into the following districts: 
1.  District 1:  Alfalfa, Beaver, Beckham, Caddo, Cimarron, 
Custer, Dewey, Ellis, Grant, Greer, Garfield, Ha rmon, Harper, 
Jackson, Kiowa, Major, Noble, Ro ger Mills, Texas, Washita, Woods and 
Woodward Counties; 
2.  District 2:  Tulsa County; 
3.  District 3:  Kay, Logan, Lincoln, Osage, Pawnee, Payne and 
Pottawatomie Counties; 
4.  District 4:  Carter, Comanche, Co tton, Garvin, Grady, Love, 
Murray, Jefferson, Stephens and Tillman Counties; 
5.  District 5:  Blaine, Canadian, Cleveland, Kingfisher, 
McClain and Oklahoma Counties; 
6.  District 6:  Atoka, B ryan, Coal, Choctaw, Creek, Hughes, 
Johnston, Latimer, LeFlore Le Flore, Marshall, McCurtain, Okfuskee, 
Pittsburg, Pontotoc, Pushmataha and Seminole Coun ties; and 
7.  District 7:  Adair, Cherokee, Craig, Delaware, Haskell, 
Mayes, McIntosh, Muskogee, Nowata, Okmulge e, Ottawa, Rogers, 
Sequoyah, Wagoner and Washington Coun ties. 
Members appointed after June 2002 shall serve no more than two (2) 
consecutive terms.   
 
SB60 HFLR 	Page 5 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  Each member shall hold office until the expiration of the 
term of office for which appointed or until a qualified successor 
has been duly appointed.  An appoint ment shall be made by the 
Governor within ninety (90) d ays after the expiration of the t erm of 
any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the Board due to 
resignation, death, or any other cause res ulting in an unexpired 
term. 
G.  Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided i n Article XV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in the article. 
H.  A member may be removed from the Bo ard by the Governor for 
cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 
1.  Ceasing to be qualified; 
2. Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdiction of a 
felony or any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due pro cess, of malfeasance, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in rel ation to Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally incompetent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision o f the Oklahoma 
Chiropractic Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three meetings of the Board without just 
cause, as determined by the Board.   
 
SB60 HFLR 	Page 6 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
I.  No member of the Board shall be: 
1.  A registered lobbyist; 
2.  An officer, board member or employee of a sta tewide 
organization established for the purpose of advoc ating the interests 
of chiropractors licensed pursuant to the Oklahoma Chiropractic 
Practice Act; or 
3.  An insurance claims adjuster, reviewer, or consultant; 
provided, however, a person shall not be considered to be a 
consultant solely for testifying in a court as an expert witness. 
SECTION 2. This act shall become effectiv e July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect an d 
be in full force from and afte r its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ADMINISTRATIVE RULES, dated 
04/06/2023 - DO PASS.