Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB602 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2023

                     
 
Req. No. 8283 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR ENGROSSED 
SENATE BILL NO. 602 	By: Rader of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Fetgatter of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation ; amending 
Section 1, Chapter 343, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S . Supp. 
2022, Section 2358.6a), which relates to bonus 
depreciation; clarifying application of depreciation; 
clarifying procedure for claiming depreciation ; 
authorizing filing of amend ed tax return under 
certain conditions; prohibiting Oklahoma Tax 
Commission from assessing penalties or interes t under 
certain conditions; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY    Section 1, Chapter 343, O.S.L. 
2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2022, Section 2358.6a), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 2358.6a  A.  As used in this section: 
1.  "Internal Revenue Code " means Title 26 of the United States 
Code also known as the federal Inte rnal Revenue Code of 1986, as 
amended;   
 
Req. No. 8283 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  "Tax Cuts and Jobs Act" means Public Law No. 115-97 (115th 
Congress Public Law 97); 
3.  "Qualified property" shall have the same meaning as in 
Internal Revenue Code Section 168(k) as the Code existed on January 
1, 2021, and shall apply to property placed in service after 
December 31, 2021; 
4. "Qualified improvement pro perty" shall have the same meaning 
as in Internal Revenue Code Section 168(e)(6 ) as the Code existed on 
January 1, 2021, and shall apply to prope rty placed in service after 
December 31, 2021; and 
5.  "Full expensing" or "one hundred percent (100%) bonus 
depreciation" means a method for taxpayers to recover costs for 
certain expenditures in research and experimentation and depreciable 
business assets by immediately deducting the full cost of suc h 
expenditures in the tax year in which the cost is incurred or the 
property is placed in service. 
B.  Taxpayers shall have the option for immediate and full 
expensing for qualified property and qualifie d improvement property 
as follows: 
1. For purposes of computing income tax for taxable years 
beginning after Decembe r 31, 2021, the cost of expenditures for 
business assets that are qualified property or qualified improvement 
property covered under Secti on 168 of the Internal Revenue Code 
shall be eligible for one hundred percent (100%) bonus depreciation   
 
Req. No. 8283 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
and may be deducted as an expense incurred by the taxpayer during 
the taxable year during which the property is placed in service, 
notwithstanding any c hanges to federal law related to amortization 
of cost recovery beginning on or after January 1, 2023, and shall 
permanently remain fully and immediately deductible as an expense in 
the tax year in which the property is placed in service for purposes 
of calculating the taxpayer's income; and 
2.  If a taxpayer elects imm ediate and full expensing of 
qualified property or qualified improvement property, any 
depreciation calculated and claimed pursuant to this section shall 
in no event be a duplication of any depreciation or bonus 
depreciation allowed or permitted on the fed eral income tax return 
of the taxpayer.  For income tax returns filed on or after January 
1, 2023, federal taxable income shall be increased by the amount of 
depreciation received under the Internal Reve nue Code for the 
qualified property or qualified impr ovement property for which the 
election has been made to immediately and fully expense the asset on 
the Oklahoma income tax return for the year in which the property 
was placed in service. A taxpayer filing a return for which federal 
taxable income is not increased as provided for in this section 
prior to October 1, 2023, shall file an amended return ref lecting 
such increase not later than June 30, 2024. The Tax Commission 
shall not assess penalties or interest with respect to the failure   
 
Req. No. 8283 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
to reflect such increase if a correct amended return is filed as 
required herein; and 
3. The taxpayer's decision to recover investment costs through 
immediate expensing in the year the investment cost is incurred, or 
amortized over an amortization schedule, is irrevocabl e unless 
specifically allowed for by the Oklahoma Tax Commission . 
C.  1.  To conform to Section 179 of the Internal Revenue Code, 
taxpayers shall be allowed to immediately deduct as an expense the 
cost of certain depreciable business assets in the tax year in which 
the property is placed in service. 
2. For purposes of computing income tax fo r taxable years 
beginning after December 31, 2021, taxpayers may elect to treat the 
cost of any Section 179 of the Internal Revenue Code property as an 
expense which is not chargeable to the capital account.  Any cost so 
treated shall be allowed as a deduc tion for the taxable year in 
which the Section 179 Internal Revenue Code property is placed in 
service. 
D.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall, within sixty (60) days of 
the effective date of this act, promulgate rules for implementation 
of this act which shall conform to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 
and must be consistent with the Internal Revenue Service's rules.  
The provisions of this section shall supersede to t he extent of any 
inconsistency with any administrative rule.   
 
Req. No. 8283 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
59-1-8283 AQH 04/19/23