SB602 HFLR Page 1 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO. 602 By: Rader of the Senate and Fetgatter of the House COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE An Act relating to revenue and taxation ; amending Section 1, Chapter 343, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S . Supp. 2022, Section 2358.6a), which relates to bonus depreciation; clarifying application of depreciation; clarifying procedure for claiming depreciation ; authorizing filing of amended tax return under certain conditions; prohibiting Oklahoma Tax Commission from assessing penalties or interes t under certain conditions; and providing an effective date. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY Section 1, Chapter 343, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2022, Section 2358.6a), is amended to read as follows: Section 2358.6a A. As used in this section: SB602 HFLR Page 2 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1. "Internal Revenue Code " means Title 26 of the United States Code also known as the federal Inte rnal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended; 2. "Tax Cuts and Jobs Act" means Public Law No. 115-97 (115th Congress Public Law 97); 3. "Qualified property" shall have the same meaning as in Internal Revenue Code Section 168(k) as th e Code existed on January 1, 2021, and shall apply to property placed in service after December 31, 2021; 4. "Qualified improvement pro perty" shall have the same meaning as in Internal Revenue Code Section 168(e)(6 ) as the Code existed on January 1, 2021, and shall apply to prope rty placed in service after December 31, 2021; and 5. "Full expensing" or "one hundred percent (100%) bonus depreciation" means a method for taxpayers to recover costs for certain expenditures in research and experimentation and d epreciable business assets by immediately deducting the full cost of suc h expenditures in the tax year in which the cost is incurred or the property is placed in service. B. Taxpayers shall have the option for immediate and full expensing for qualified pr operty and qualified improvement property as follows: 1. For purposes of computing income tax for taxable years beginning after Decembe r 31, 2021, the cost of expenditures for SB602 HFLR Page 3 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 business assets that are qualified property or qualified improvement property covered under Section 168 of the Internal Revenue Code shall be eligible for one hundred percent (100%) bonus depreciation and may be deducted as an expense incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year during which the property is placed in service, notwithstanding any changes to federal law related to amortization of cost recovery beginning on or after January 1, 2023, and shall permanently remain fully and immediately deductible as an expense in the tax year in which the property is placed in service f or purposes of calculating the taxpayer's income; and 2. If a taxpayer elects imm ediate and full expensing of qualified property or qualified improvement property, any depreciation calculated and claimed pursuant to this section shall in no event be a dup lication of any depreciation or bonus depreciation allowed or permitted on the fed eral income tax return of the taxpayer. For income tax returns filed on or after January 1, 2023, federal taxable income shall be increased by the amount of depreciation received under the Internal Reve nue Code for the qualified property or qualified impr ovement property for which the election has been made to immediately and fully expense the asset on the Oklahoma income tax return for the year in which the property was placed in service. A taxpayer filing a return for which federal taxable income is not increased as provided for in this section prior to October 1, 2023, shall file an amended return ref lecting SB602 HFLR Page 4 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 such increase not later than June 30, 2024. The Tax Commission shall not assess penalties or interest with respect to the failure to reflect such increase if a correct amended return is filed as required herein; and 3. The taxpayer's decision to recover investment costs through immediate expensing in the year the investment cost is incurred, or amortized over an amortization schedule, is irrevocabl e unless specifically allowed for by the Oklahoma Tax Commission . C. 1. To conform to Section 179 of the Internal Revenue Code, taxpayers shall be allowed to immediately deduct as an expense the cost of certain depreciable business assets in the tax year in which the property is placed in service. 2. For purposes of computing income tax fo r taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021, taxpayers may elect to treat the cost of any Section 179 of the Internal Revenue Code property as an expense which is not chargeable to the capital account. Any cost so treated shall be allowed as a deduc tion for the taxable year in which the Section 179 Internal Revenue Code property is placed in service. D. The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall, within sixty (60) days of the effective date of this act, promulgate rules for implementation of this act which shall conform to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 and must be consistent with the Internal Revenue Service's rules. SB602 HFLR Page 5 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 The provisions of this section shall supersede to t he extent of any inconsistency with any administrative rule. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS AND BUDGET , dated 04/20/2023 - DO PASS, As Amended.