Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB703 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/15/2023

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB703 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 14, 2023 
 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 703 	By: Murdock 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Administrative Worker s’ 
Compensation Act; amending 85A O.S. 20 21, Section 
122, which relates to costs of administering act; 
modifying requirements for payments from Multiple 
Injury Trust Fund; updating statutory reference; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     85A O.S . 2021, Section 122, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 122. A.  The Workers’ Compensation Commission Revolving 
Fund established by Section 28.1 of t his title shall be used for the 
costs of administering this act the Administrative Workers ’ 
Compensation Act and for other purposes as authorized by law. 
B.  For the purpose of providing funds for the Workers’ 
Compensation Commission Revolving Fund, for the Workers’ 
Compensation Administrative Fund c reated in Section 401.1 of this 
title, for the Multiple Injury Trust Fund created in Section 28 of 
this title, and to fund other provisions within this title, the 
following tax rates shall apply:   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB703 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  Each mutual or interinsurance association, stock company , 
CompSource Mutual Insurance Company or other insurance carrier 
writing workers’ compensation insurance in this state shall pay to 
the Oklahoma Tax Commission an assessment at a rate of one percent 
(1%) of all gross direct premiums written during each qua rter of the 
calendar year for workers’ compensation insurance on risks located 
in this state after deducting from such gross direct premiums, 
return premiums, unabsorbed portions of any deposit premiums, polic y 
dividends, safety refunds, savings and other similar returns paid or 
credited to policyholders.  Such payments to the Tax Commission 
shall be made not later than the fifteenth day of the month 
following the close of each quarter of the calendar year in w hich 
such gross direct premium is collected or collectible.  
Contributions made by insurance carriers and CompSource Mutual 
Insurance Company, under the provisions of this section, shall be 
considered for the purpose of computing workers ’ compensation rates; 
and 
2.  When an employer is authorized to be come a self-insurer, the 
Commission shall so notify the Tax Commission, giving the effective 
date of such authorization.  The Tax Commission shall then assess 
and collect from the employers carrying their own risk an assessment 
at the rate of two percent ( 2%) of the total compensation for 
permanent total disability awards, permanent partial disability 
awards and death benefits paid out during each quarter of the   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB703 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
calendar year by the employers.  Such assessment shall be payable by 
the employers and collected by the Tax Commission according to the 
provisions of this section regarding payment and collection of the 
assessment created in paragraph 1 of this subsection. 
C.  It shall be the duty of the Tax Commission t o collect the 
payments provided for in this tit le.  The Tax Commission is hereby 
authorized to bring an action for the recovery of any delinquent or 
unpaid payments required in this section.  The Tax Commission may 
also enforce payments by proceeding in ac cordance with the 
provisions of Section 98 of t his title. 
D.  The Tax Commission shall pay monthly to the State Treasurer 
to the credit of the Multiple Injury Trust Fund all monies collected 
under the provisions of this section less the annual amounts whic h 
shall be apportioned by the Oklahoma Tax Comm ission as follows; 
provided, however, if the F und in any one month is insufficient to 
make the required payments, the unpaid portion shall be pa id as soon 
as funds become available : 
1.  Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00) shall be payable each 
fiscal year in equal monthly installments to the credit of the 
Workers’ Compensation Commission Revolving Fund established in 
Section 28.1 of this title for the fiscal year ending June 30, 20 16, 
Three Million Dollars ($3,000,000.00) for the fiscal year ending 
June 30, 2017, and Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) for the   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB703 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, and for all subsequent years to be 
used to implement the provisions of this title; and 
2. Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) shall be payable in 
equal monthly installments to the credit of the Workers’ 
Compensation Administrative Fund established in Section 401.1 of 
this title for the fiscal ye ar ending June 30, 2016, Three Million 
Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($3,500,000.00) for the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2017, Three Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($3,500,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, Three 
Million Dollars ($3,0 00,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 
2019, One Million Seven Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars 
($1,750,000.00) for the f iscal year ending June 30, 2020, One 
Million Seven Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($1,750,000.00) for the 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and for all subsequent years 
during the existence of the Court of Existing Claims. 
Monies deposited in the Workers ’ Compensation Administr ative 
Fund shall be used by the Workers’ Compensation Court of Existing 
Claims to implement provisio ns provided for in thi s title. 
E.  The refund provisions of Sections 227 through 229 of Title 
68 of the Oklahoma Statutes shall be app licable to any paymen ts made 
pursuant to this section. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB703 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
declared to exist, by reason w hereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RETIREMENT AND INSURANCE 
February 14, 2023 - DO PASS