Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB707 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/02/2023

                     
 
Req. No. 1897 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL 707 	By: Rosino of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Roe of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to public health and safety ; amending 
63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-317, as last amended by 
Section 1, Chapter 184, O.S.L. 2022 (63 O.S. Supp. 
2022, Section 1-317), which relates to death 
certificates; extending time period s of certain 
requirements; granting immunity from civil damages 
under certain conditions; requiring the Office of the 
Chief Medical Examiner to make certain disclosure; 
requiring certain notice to contain specified 
information; imposing certain duty on licensed 
funeral directors; directing creation of certain 
process; updating statutory language; providing for 
codification; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     63 O.S. 2021, Section 1 -317, as 
last amended by Section 1, Chapter 184, O.S.L. 2022 (63 O.S. Supp. 
2022, Section 1-317), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 1-317. A.  A death certificate for each death which 
occurs in this state sha ll be filed with the State Department of 
Health, within three (3) six (6) calendar days after such death.   
 
Req. No. 1897 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  The funeral directo r shall personally si gn the death 
certificate and shall be responsible for filing the death 
certificate.  If the funeral director is not availab le, the person 
acting as such who first assumes c ustody of a dead body in 
accordance with Section 1158 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma St atutes 
shall personally sign and file the de ath certificate.  The personal 
data shall be obtained from the next of kin or t he best qualified 
person or source available.  The certificate shall be completed as 
to personal data and delive red to the attending physician or the 
medical examiner responsibl e for completing the medical 
certification portion of the certificate of death within twenty-four 
(24) hours after the death.  No later than July 1, 2012, the 
personal data, and no later than July 1, 2017, the me dical 
certificate portion, shall be entered into the prescribed electronic 
system provided by the State Registrar of Vital Statistics and the 
information submitted to the State Registra r of Vital Statistics.  
The resultant certificate produced by the elect ronic system shall be 
provided to the physic ian or medical examiner for medical 
certification within twenty-four (24) hours after the death. 
C.  The medical certification shall be compl eted and signed 
within forty-eight (48) hours five (5) calendar days after death 
receipt of the death certificate by the physician, physician 
assistant, or advanced practice re gistered nurse Advanced Practice 
Registered Nurse in charge of the patient’s care for the illness or   
 
Req. No. 1897 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
condition which resulted in death, except when inquiry as to the 
cause of death is required by S ection 938 of this title.  No later 
than July 1, 2017, the medical certification portion of ce rtificate 
data shall be entered into the prescribed electronic system provided 
by the State Registrar of Vital Statistics and the information 
submitted to the Sta te Registrar of Vital Statistics. 
D.  In the event that the physician, physician assistant, or 
advanced practice re gistered nurse Advanced Practice Re gistered 
Nurse in charge of the patient’s care for the illness or conditio n 
which resulted in death is not in attendance at the time of death , 
the medical certification shall be complete d and signed within 
forty-eight (48) hours five (5) calendar days after death receipt of 
the death certificate by the physician, physician assistant, or 
advanced practice re gistered nurse Advanced Practice Registered 
Nurse in attendance at the time of death, except: 
1.  When the patient is under hospi ce care at the time of d eath, 
the medical certification may be signed by the hospice ’s medical 
director; and 
2.  When inquiry as to the cause of death is required by Se ction 
938 of this title. 
Provided, that such certification, if sig ned by other than the 
attending physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice 
registered nurse Advanced Practice Registered Nurse , shall note on 
the face the name of the attending physician, physician assistant,   
 
Req. No. 1897 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
or advanced practice re gistered nurse Advanced Practice Registered 
Nurse and that the information shown is only as reported. 
E.  A certifier completin g cause of death on a ce rtificate of 
death who knows that a lethal d rug, overdose or other means of 
assisting suicide within the meaning of Section s 3141.2 through 
3141.4 of this title caus ed or contributed to the death shall list 
that means among the chai n of events under cause of death or list it 
in the box that describe s how the injury occurred.  If such means is 
in the chain of events under cause of death or in the box that 
describes how the injury occurred, the certifier shall indicate 
“suicide” as the manner of death. 
F.  The authority of a physician assistant to carry out the 
functions described in this section shall be governed by the 
practice agreement as provided by Section 519.6 of Title 59 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes. 
G.  A physician, physician assi stant, or Advanced Practice 
Registered Nurse completing and signing a medical certification in 
accordance with this section shall not be liable in a civil action 
to recover damages for any acts or omissions relating to the medical 
certification if the cause of death is determined in good faith 
using the individual ’s best clinical judgment consistent with 
current guidance provided by the applicable licensing board, u nless 
the acts or omissions amount to willful or wanton misconduct.  The 
immunity provided by this subsection shall be in addition to any   
 
Req. No. 1897 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
other immunity from liability to which these individuals may be 
entitled. 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 944.3 of Title 63, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  If, in the course of an investigation, the Office of the 
Chief Medical Examiner declines to conduct an autopsy under Section 
944 of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes, the Office shall so inform 
the person legally entitled to the custody of the body of the 
deceased, or his or her repre sentative to whom the body is released 
under Section 941a of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes, through a 
written or electronic notice which the Office shall provide to such 
person or representative at the time of release of the body.  The 
notice shall contain the contact information of a family assistance 
coordinator for the purpose of implementing subsection C of this 
section.  The notice shall state that the person may have the right 
to request a private autopsy at personal expense from an authorized 
physician or hospital under Section 1154 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes. 
B. If the body is released to a representative of the person 
legally entitled to the custody of the body and if that 
representative is a funeral director licensed in this state, the 
funeral director shall provide the person with the notice described 
in this section upon receipt of the body.   
 
Req. No. 1897 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
C.  The Office shall create a process by which the person 
legally entitled to the custody of a body, or his or her 
representative, may ask questions of, and receive responses from, a 
family assistance coordinator regarding the medicolegal 
investigation and other relevant topics within the purview of the 
Office. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall becom e effective November 1, 2023. 
 
59-1-1897 DC 3/2/2023 10:57:51 AM