Oklahoma 2025 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB132 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/24/2025

                     
 
SB132 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 60th Legislature (2025) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR ENGROSSED 
SENATE BILL NO. 132 	By: Burns and Green of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Boles of the House 
 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Corporation Commission; 
amending 17 O.S. 2021, Section 53, which relates to 
plugging wells; establishing maximum time period for 
plugging certain wells; defining terms; directing 
rule promulgation; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     17 O.S. 2021, Section 53, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 53.  A. The Corporation Commission is hereby authorized 
to promulgate rules for the plugg ing of all abandoned idle oil and 
gas wells.  Abandoned wells Idle wells shall be plugged under the 
direction and supervision of Commission employees as may be 
prescribed by the Commission.  Provided, however, the Commission   
 
SB132 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
shall not order any oil or gas well to be plugged or closed if the 
well is located on an otherwise producing oil or gas lease as 
defined by the Commission, unless such well poses an imminent threat 
to the public health and safety which shall be determined by the 
Commission after conduct ing a public hearing on the matter. 
B.  An idle gas well shall be plugged if it has not produced gas 
within the last ten (10) years, provided that the operator, owner, 
or other responsible parties may be granted an exception by 
demonstrating good cause to the Corporation Commission.  Good cause 
may include, but is not limited to, evidence regarding the gas 
well's future use for production, injection, carbon storage, and 
geothermal energy generation, pursuant to Corporation Commission 
rules. 
C.  An operator with multiple idle gas wells that have not 
produced gas for ten (10) years prior to the effective date of this 
act shall reduce the number of idle gas wells by plugging or 
producing from such wells, provided that the operator, owner, or 
other responsible parties may be granted an exemption by 
demonstrating good cause to the Corporation Commission.  Good cause 
may include, but is not limited to, evidence regarding the gas 
well's future use for production, injection, carbon storage, and 
geothermal energy gene ration, pursuant to Corporation Commission 
rules.  The reduction of idle gas wells shall be as follows:   
 
SB132 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  Not later than July 1, 2028, by reducing the number of idle 
gas wells by at least twenty -five percent (25%); 
2.  Not later than July 1, 2031, by red ucing the number of idle 
gas wells by at least fifty percent (50%); and 
3.  Not later than July 1, 2035, by plugging or producing from 
all remaining idle gas wells. 
D.  As used in this section: 
1.  "Idle well" or "idle gas well" means a nonproducing well 
with respect to which there has been no commercial production (i.e., 
from which there has been no sale of crude oil or natural gas) for 
the preceding ten (10) years; and no reasonable case is made by the 
named operator for its future use, including, without limitation, 
for production, injection, carbon storage, and geothermal energy 
generation; 
2.  "Nonproducing well" means a well that was drilled for the 
purpose of producing hydrocarbons and that is currently shut -in or 
temporarily abandoned; 
3.  "Shut-in" means a well that is completed, not producing, but 
is mechanically capable of production and has requisite surface 
facilities; and 
4.  "Temporarily abandoned” means a well that is completed, not 
producing, and is not shut -in.   
 
SB132 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  The Commission shall promu lgate rules to effectuate the 
provisions of this section and establish any necessary enforcement 
measures. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2025. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ENERGY AND NATURAL RESOURCES 
OVERSIGHT, dated 04/24/2025 - DO PASS, As Amended.