Oklahoma 2025 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB940 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/17/2025

                     
 
SB940 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 60th Legislature (2025) 
 
ENGROSSED SENATE 
BILL NO. 940 	By: Jech of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Dobrinski and Ranson of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to harmful woody species; direct ing 
the Oklahoma Conservation Commission to implement 
certain plan; requiring certain report to be compiled 
and presented to Commission by certain date; 
authorizing the Commission to implement certain plans 
to assist state agencies; directing the agencies to 
submit reports each year on progress; defining term; 
providing for promulgation of rules; providing for 
codification; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 3-9-100 of Title 27A, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  The Oklahoma Conservation Commission shall implement a 
statewide plan for the control, removal, and eradication of harmful 
woody species on state-owned, -leased, or -operated land.   
 
SB940 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  On or before January 1, 2026, a report shall be compiled and 
presented to the Commission from the Oklahoma Department of 
Agriculture, Food, and Forestry, the Commissioners of the Land 
Office, the Department of Wildlife Conservation, the Department of 
Corrections, the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department, the 
Department of Transportation, and the Oklahoma Turnpike Authority 
with a comprehensive report to determine the affected inventory and 
subsequent plan to control, remove, or eradicate harmful woody 
species from state-owned, -leased, or -operated properties. The 
Commission shall assist in the administration of the agency ’s plan 
and develop any necessary programs to expand the capabilities of 
each agency’s approach to control, remove, or eradicate harmful 
woody specifies. 
C.  The agencies specified in subsection B of this section shall 
electronically submit to the Legislature an annu al report by 
November 1, 2026, and each subsequent year by November 1, detailing 
the progress of the control, removal, and eradication of harmful 
woody species on state -owned, -leased, or -operated land. 
D.  As used in this section, “harmful woody species” means a 
tree or shrub species that is rapidly encroaching into adjoining 
lands and is likely to cause harm to the environment or economy.  
Harmful woody species include, but are not limited to, Juniperus 
virginiana (Eastern Redcedar), Juniperus scopulorum (Rocky Mountain   
 
SB940 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
juniper), Juniperus monosperma (oneseed juniper) , and Tamarix 
ramosissima (salt cedar). 
E.  The Oklahoma Conservation Commission shall promulgate rules 
necessary to implement the provisions of this section. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2025. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ENERGY AND NATURAL RESOURCES 
OVERSIGHT, dated 04/16/2025 - DO PASS, As Coauthored .