Oklahoma 2025 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB99 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/20/2024

                     
 
 
Req. No. 1095 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 60th Legislature (2025) 
 
SENATE BILL 99 	By: Boren 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to income tax credit; amending 68 
O.S. 2021, Section 2357.46, which relates to tax 
credit for construction of energy effici ent property; 
modifying tax year for which credit can be claimed; 
requiring property to be completed in the year in 
which the credit is claimed; updating statutory 
language; updating statutory reference; and providing 
an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.    AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.46, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 2357.46.  A.  Except as otherwise provided by subsection 
G of this section, for the time period beginning on or after January 
1, 2006, and ending on July 1, 2016 tax years 2006 through 2016 and 
tax year 2025 and subsequent tax years , there shall be allowed a 
credit against the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title for 
eligible expenditures i ncurred by a contractor in the construction 
of energy efficient residential p roperty of two thousand (2,000) 
square feet or less.  The amount of the credit shall be based upon 
the following:   
 
 
Req. No. 1095 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  For any eligible energy efficient residential property 
constructed and certified as forty percent (40%) or more above the 
2003 International Energy Conservation Code 2003 and any supplement 
in effect at the time of completion, the amount of the credit shall 
be equal to the eligible expenses, not to exceed Four Thous and 
Dollars ($4,000.00) for the taxpayer who is the contractor; and 
2.  For any eligible energy efficient residential property 
constructed and certified as between twenty percent (20%) and 
thirty-nine percent (39%) above the 2003 International Energy 
Conservation Code 2003 and any supplement in effect at the time of 
completion, the credit shall be equal to the eligible expenditures, 
not to exceed Two Thousand Dollars ($2,000.00) for the taxpayer who 
is the contractor. 
B.  As used in this section: 
1.  “Eligible expenditure” means any: 
a. energy efficient heating or cooling system, 
b. insulation material or system which is specifically 
and primarily designed to reduce the heat gain or loss 
of a residential property when installed in or on such 
property, 
c. exterior windows, including skylights, 
d. exterior doors, and 
e. any metal roof installed on a residential property, 
but only if such roof has appropriate pigmented   
 
 
Req. No. 1095 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
coatings which are specifically and primarily designed 
to reduce the heat gain of such dwellin g unit and 
which meet Energy Star program requirements; 
2.  “Contractor” means the taxpayer who constructed the 
residential property or manufactured home, or if more than one 
taxpayer qualifies as the contractor, the primary contractor; and 
3.  “Eligible energy efficient residential property ” means a 
newly constructed residential property or manufactured home property 
which is located in the State of Oklahoma this state and 
substantially complete after December 31, 2005 completed in the 
calendar year corres ponding to the tax year in which the credit is 
claimed, and which is two thou sand (2,000) square feet or less: 
a. for the credit provided pursuant to paragraph 1 of 
subsection A of this section, which is certified by an 
accredited Residential Energy Servic es Network 
Provider using the Home Energy Rating System to have: 
(1) a level of annual heating and cooling energy 
consumption which is at least forty percent (40%) 
below the annual level of heating and cooling 
energy consumption of a comparable residential 
property constructed in accordance with the 
standards of Chapter 4 of the 20 03 International 
Energy Conservation Code, as such code is in 
effect on November 1, 2005,   
 
 
Req. No. 1095 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
(2) heating and cooling equipment efficiencies which 
correspond to the minimum allowed un der the 
regulations established by the United States 
Department of Energy pursuant to the National 
Appliance Energy Conservation Act of 1987 and in 
effect at the time of construction of the 
property, and 
(3) building envelope component improvements which 
account for at least one -fifth (1/5) of the 
reduced annual heating and cooling energy 
consumption levels, and 
b. for the credit provided pursuant to paragraph 2 of 
subsection A of this section, which is certified by an 
accredited Residential Energy Services Network 
Provider using the Home Energy Rating System to have: 
(1) a level of annual heating and cooling energy 
consumption which is between twenty percent (20%) 
and thirty-nine percent (39%) below the annual 
level of heating and cooling energy consumption 
of a comparable residential property constructed 
in accordance with the stan dards of Chapter 4 of 
the 2003 International Energy Conservation Code, 
as such code is in effect on November 1, 2005,   
 
 
Req. No. 1095 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
(2) heating and cooling equipment efficiencies which 
correspond to the minimum allowed under the 
regulations established by the United States 
Department of Energy pursuant to the National 
Appliance Energy Conservation Act of 1987 and in 
effect at the time of construction of the 
property, and 
(3) building envelope co mponent improvements which 
account for at least one -third (1/3) of the 
reduced annual heating and cooling energy 
consumption levels. 
C.  The credit provided for in subsection A of this section may 
only be claimed once for the contractor of any eligible res idential 
energy efficient property during the taxable year when the property 
is substantially complete. 
D.  If the credit allowed pursuant to this section exceeds the 
amount of income taxes due or if there are no state income taxes due 
on the income of the taxpayer, the amount of credit allowed but not 
used in any taxable year may be carried forward as a credit against 
subsequent income tax liability for a period not exceeding four (4) 
tax years following the qualified expenditures. 
E.  For credits earned o n or after July 1, 2006, the credits 
authorized by this section shall be freely transferable to 
subsequent transferees.   
 
 
Req. No. 1095 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall promulgate rules necessary 
to implement this act this section. 
G.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
section may be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act occurring on or after July 1, 2010 , for 
which the credit would otherwise be allowable.  The provisions of 
this subsection shall cease to be op erative on July 1, 2012.  
Beginning July 1, 2012, the credit authorized by this section may be 
claimed for any event, transaction, investment, expenditure or other 
act occurring on or after July 1, 2012, according to the provisions 
of this section. 
H.  No credit otherwise authorized by the provisions of this 
section may be claimed for any event, transaction, investment, 
expenditure or other act occurring on or after July 1, 2016, for 
which the credit would otherwise be allowable. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2025. 
 
60-1-1095 QD 12/20/2024 6:50:20 PM