1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 83rd OREGON LEGISLATIVE ASSEMBLY--2025 Regular Session House Bill 3892 Sponsored by Representative RUIZ SUMMARY The following summary is not prepared by the sponsors of the measure and is not a part of the body thereof subject to consideration by the Legislative Assembly. It is an editor’s brief statement of the essential features of the measure as introduced.The statement includes a measure digest written in compliance with applicable readability standards. Digest: The Act creates a task force to help adult learners go back to community college. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Establishes the Task Force on Community College Adult Reconnect. Directs the task force to study and make recommendations related to assisting adult learners to overcome barriers to earning a degree or credential. Sunsets the task force on December 31, 2026. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025. A BILL FOR AN ACT Relating to the Task Force on Community College Adult Reconnect; and declaring an emergency. Be It Enacted by the People of the State of Oregon: SECTION 1. (1) The Task Force on Community College Adult Reconnect is established. (2) The task force consists of 17 members appointed by the executive director of the Higher Education Coordinating Commission as follows: (a) Two members from community college instructional administration; (b) Two members who are student services administrators at a community college; (c) Two members who are registrars at a community college; (d) Two members who are advisors at a community college; (e) Two members who are staff of a community college working in admissions, enroll- ment and recruiting; (f) Two members who are career pathways administrators at a community college; (g) One member who is a student at a community college; (h) Two members from the Oregon Community College Association; and (i) Two members from the Office of Community Colleges and Workforce Development in the Higher Education Coordinating Commission. (3) The task force shall study and provide recommendations on the following: (a) Defining “student eligibility” for a program designed to assist adult learners to over- come barriers to earning a degree or credential; and (b) Developing components of the program, including: (A) Tuition assistance; (B) Non-tuition financial assistance, which may include child care and transportation assistance; (C) Specialized benefits navigators who help students to access any available resources; (D) Solutions for how to address any past-due institutional balance; (E) Institutional incentives designed to grant credit for prior learning; and (F) Identifying any potential vendor for services to reconnect adult learners to a com- NOTE:Matter in boldfaced type in an amended section is new; matter [italic and bracketed] is existing law to be omitted. New sections are in boldfaced type. LC 4555 HB3892 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 munitycollege. (4) A majority of the members of the task force constitutes a quorum for the transaction ofbusiness. (5) Official action by the task force requires the approval of a majority of the members of the task force. (6) The executive director of the Higher Education Coordinating Commission shall select one member of the task force to serve as chairperson and another member to serve as vice chairperson. (7) If there is a vacancy for any cause, the appointing authority shall make an appoint- ment to become immediately effective. (8) The task force shall meet at times and places specified by the call of the chairperson or of a majority of the members of the task force. (9) The task force may adopt rules necessary for the operation of the task force. (10) The task force shall submit a comprehensive report in the manner provided in ORS 192.245, and may include recommendations for legislation, regarding implementation of the program described in subsection (3) of this section to the interim committees of the Legis- lative Assembly related to higher education no later than December 15, 2026. (11) The Higher Education Coordinating Commission shall provide staff support to the taskforce. (12) Members of the task force serve as volunteers on the task force and, unless they are qualified members, as defined in ORS 292.495, are not entitled to compensation or re- imbursement for expenses. (13) All agencies of state government, as defined in ORS 174.111, are directed to assist the task force in the performance of the duties of the task force and, to the extent permitted by laws relating to confidentiality, to furnish information and advice the members of the task force consider necessary to perform their duties. (14) All appointments to the task force made under subsection (2) of this section must be completed by the later of 90 days after adjournment sine die of the 2025 session of the Eighty-third Legislative Assembly or October 1, 2025. (15) The task force shall have its first meeting on or before the later of 100 days after adjournment sine die of the 2025 session of the Eighty-third Legislative Assembly or October 15, 2025. SECTION 2. Section 1 of this 2025 Act is repealed on December 31, 2026. SECTION 3.This 2025 Act being necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health and safety, an emergency is declared to exist, and this 2025 Act takes effect July 1, 2025. [2]