1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 83rd OREGON LEGISLATIVE ASSEMBLY--2025 Regular Session Senate Bill 1011 Sponsored by Senators BROADMAN, MCLANE, Representatives HARTMAN, MCINTIRE, SANCHEZ; Senator NASH SUMMARY The following summary is not prepared by the sponsors of the measure and is not a part of the body thereof subject to consideration by the Legislative Assembly. It is an editor’s brief statement of the essential features of the measure as introduced.The statement includes a measure digest written in compliance with applicable readability standards. Digest: The Act says an Indian tribe in this state can ask the Governor to help retrocede P.L. 280 for the tribe. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.6). Allows a federally recognized Indian tribe located in this state to submit a request to the Gov- ernor for retrocession of Public Law 280 jurisdiction. Prescribes the Governor’s duties. Declares an emergency, effective on passage. A BILL FOR AN ACT Relating to Public Law 280; and declaring an emergency. Be It Enacted by the People of the State of Oregon: SECTION 1. (1) As used in this section, “P.L. 280 jurisdiction” means the authority granted to this state over specific criminal and civil matters in a federally recognized Indian tribe located in this state, under Public Law 280, codified at 18 U.S.C. 1162 and 25 U.S.C. 1321, and pursuant to: (a) Public Law 95-195, codified at 25 U.S.C. 711(d)(6), November 18, 1977 (Siletz Indian Tribe Restoration Act); (b) Public Law 98-165, codified at 25 U.S.C. 713f(c)(6), November 22, 1983 (Grand Ronde RestorationAct); (c) Public Law 98-481, codified at 25 U.S.C. 714e, October 17, 1984 (Coos, Lower Umpqua and Siuslaw Restoration Act); (d) Public Law 99-398, codified at 25 U.S.C. 556e, August 27, 1986 (Klamath Indian Tribe Restoration Act); and (e) Public Law 101-42, codified at 25 U.S.C. 715d, June 28, 1989 (Coquille Restoration Act). (2)(a) The governing body of a federally recognized Indian tribe located in this state may submit to the Governor a resolution formally adopted by the governing body to request retrocession of P.L. 280 jurisdiction. The request may be for P.L. 280 jurisdiction retrocession in whole or in part. (b) A tribe may request retrocession only on its own behalf. (3)(a) Within 10 days after the date on which the Governor receives a request for P.L. 280 jurisdiction retrocession, the Governor shall acknowledge receipt to the requesting tribe. (b) Within 90 days after the date on which the Governor receives a request for P.L. 280 jurisdiction retrocession, the Governor shall convene a meeting with the representatives of the requesting tribe to discuss the request for P.L. 280 jurisdiction retrocession, including but not limited to the implications and logistical aspects of the retrocession. (c) Subject to paragraph (d) of this subsection, the Governor shall accept or deny a re- NOTE:Matter in boldfaced type in an amended section is new; matter [italic and bracketed] is existing law to be omitted. New sections are in boldfaced type. LC 4073 SB1011 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 quest for P.L. 280 jurisdiction retrocession within 180 days after receiving the request and notify the requesting tribe of the Governor’s decision. If the Governor accepts the request, the Governor shall within 10 days after the decision petition the United States Secretary of the Interior pursuant to 25 U.S.C. 1323, and any regulations promulgated thereunder, for P.L. 280 jurisdiction retrocession as described in the request. The Governor by proclamation may declare intent to petition the United States Secretary of the Interior as described in this paragraph. If the Governor denies the request, the Governor shall identify the reasons for the denial and communicate in good faith with the requesting tribe regarding the denial. (d) The Governor and the requesting tribe may by mutual consent agree to extend the timeframe described in paragraph (c) of this subsection up to an additional 180 days. (4) The retrocession of P.L. 280 jurisdiction shall not diminish or abrogate the sover- eignty of a tribe that requests retrocession. The tribe shall retain the prerogative to govern the tribe’s territory and population in accordance with tribal law, policy and tradition. SECTION 2. This 2025 Act being necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health and safety, an emergency is declared to exist, and this 2025 Act takes effect on its passage. [2]