Pennsylvania 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB241 Introduced / Bill

                     
PRINTER'S NO. 194 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.241 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY COLEMAN, K. WARD, PHILLIPS-HILL, LANGERHOLC, 
ROTHMAN, BROWN, HUTCHINSON, BAKER, MASTRIANO, STEFANO, 
MARTIN, LAUGHLIN, DUSH AND PENNYCUICK, FEBRUARY 13, 2025 
REFERRED TO LAW AND JUSTICE, FEBRUARY 13, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), entitled "An 
act relating to alcoholic liquors, alcohol and malt and 
brewed beverages; amending, revising, consolidating and 
changing the laws relating thereto; regulating and 
restricting the manufacture, purchase, sale, possession, 
consumption, importation, transportation, furnishing, holding 
in bond, holding in storage, traffic in and use of alcoholic 
liquors, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages and the 
persons engaged or employed therein; defining the powers and 
duties of the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board; providing 
for the establishment and operation of State liquor stores, 
for the payment of certain license fees to the respective 
municipalities and townships, for the abatement of certain 
nuisances and, in certain cases, for search and seizure 
without warrant; prescribing penalties and forfeitures; 
providing for local option, and repealing existing laws," in 
Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, providing for expungement 
of citations regarding COVID-19 protocols.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  The act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known 
as the Liquor Code, is amended by adding a section to read:
Section 219.  Expungement of Citations Regarding COVID-19 
Protocols.--(a)   	Subject to subsection (b), a citation issued by  
the board or the enforcement bureau to a retail licensee for 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25 failure of the retail licensee to comply with any of the 
following executive actions during the period in which the 
Governor's Proclamation of Disaster Emergency issued on March 6, 
2020, published at 50 Pa.B. 1644 (March 21, 2020)  was in effect  
shall be expunged by the board or the enforcement bureau, as 
applicable:
(1)  A proclamation or order of the Governor under 35 Pa.C.S. 
§ 7301(f)(7) (relating to general authority of Governor), 
s ection 8(a) of the act of April 27, 1905 (P.L.312,  
No.218),  entitled "An act creating a Department of Health, and  
defining its powers and duties,"  section 2102(a) of the act of  
April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative 
Code of 1929, or section 5 of the act of April 23, 1956 (1955 
P.L.1510, No.500), known as the Disease Prevention and Control 
Law of 1955, which relates to the novel coronavirus known as 
"COVID-19."
(2)   An order of the Secretary of Health under  	s ection 8(a) 
of the act of April 27, 1905 (P.L.312, No.218),   entitled "An act  
creating a Department of Health, and defining its powers and 
duties," section 2102(a) or 2106 of The Administrative Code of  
1929, section 5 of the  	Disease Prevention and Control Law of  
1955  or 28 Pa. Code § 27.60 (relating to disease control  
measures), 27.61 (relating to isolation), 27.65 (relating to 
quarantine), 27.66 (relating to placarding), 27.67 (relating to 
movement of persons and animals subject to isolation or 
quarantine by action of a local health authority or the 
Department) or 27.68 (relating to release from isolation or 
quarantine), which relates to the novel coronavirus known as 
"COVID-19."
(3)  Guidance issued by the Department of Health or the 
20250SB0241PN0194 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 Department of Human Services relating to the novel coronavirus 
known as "COVID-19."
(b)  If the board or enforcement bureau issued a citation to 
a retail licensee as described in subsection (a), the board or 
enforcement bureau, as applicable, shall:
(1)  expunge the citation, if the imposition of the citation 
was for a violation of executive action described in subsection 
(a) at no cost to the retail licensee within 30 days of the 
effective date of this paragraph; and
(2)  provide notice of the expungement to the retail 
licensee.
(c)   As used in this section, the following words and phrases  
shall have the meanings given to them in this subsection:
"Retail licensee" shall mean a person that holds a hotel 
license, a restaurant liquor license, an eating place retail 
dispenser license, a club license or a catering club license 
under this act.
Section 2.  This act shall take effect immediately.
20250SB0241PN0194 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18