Pennsylvania 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB354 Introduced / Bill

                     
PRINTER'S NO. 292 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.354 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY BROWN, PENNYCUICK, HUTCHINSON, KEARNEY AND CULVER, 
FEBRUARY 26, 2025 
REFERRED TO EDUCATION, FEBRUARY 26, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), entitled "An 
act relating to the public school system, including certain 
provisions applicable as well to private and parochial 
schools; amending, revising, consolidating and changing the 
laws relating thereto," in charter schools, further providing 
for funding for charter schools, for provisions applicable to 
charter schools and for applicability of other provisions of 
this act and of other acts and regulations.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  Section 1725-A(a)(3) of the act of March 10, 1949 
(P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, is 
amended and the subsection is amended by adding a clause to 
read:
Section 1725-A.  Funding for Charter Schools.--(a)  Funding 
for a charter school shall be provided in the following manner:
* * *
(3)  For the 1997-1998 school year through the 2024-2025 
school year, for special education students, the charter school 
shall receive for each student enrolled the same funding as for 
each non-special education student as provided in clause (2), 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21 plus an additional amount determined by dividing the district of 
residence's total special education expenditure by the product 
of multiplying the combined percentage of section 2509.5(k) 
times the district of residence's total average daily membership 
for the prior school year. This amount shall be paid by the 
district of residence of each student.
(3.1)  (i)  For the 2025-2026 school year and each school 
year thereafter, for special education students, the charter 
school shall receive for each student enrolled an amount which 
shall be paid by the district of residence of each student to be 
determined as follows:
(A)  For each special education student enrolled in the 
charter school for which the annual expenditure is in Category 1 
as reported to the department under section 1372(8) multiply the 
same funding as for each non-special education student as 
provided in clause (2) by one and fifty-one hundredths (1.51).
(B)  For each special education student enrolled in the 
charter school for which the annual expenditure is in Category 2 
as reported to the department under section 1372(8) multiply the 
same funding as for each non-special education student as 
provided in clause (2) by three and seventy-seven hundredths 
(3.77).
(C)  For each special education student enrolled in the 
charter school for which the annual expenditure is in Category 3 
as reported to the department under section 1372(8) multiply the 
same funding as for each non-special education student as 
provided in clause (2) by seven and forty-six hundredths (7.46). 
For purposes of this paragraph, Category 3 shall be the sum of 
students reported in Categories 3A and 3B under section 1372(8).
(ii)  Pursuant to guidelines developed by the department, to 
20250SB0354PN0292 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 be eligible to receive funding for special education students 
under subclause (i), the charter school must document the cost 
of providing an education to the student and provide the 
documentation to the department and the school district of 
residence.
(iii)  Each weight provided in subclause (i)(A), (B) and (C) 
shall be updated whenever the weights in section 2509.5(bbb)(2)
(i) are adjusted for school districts.
(iv)  In no case shall the calculation made in subclause (i)
(A) and (B) result in a payment that exceeds the maximum amount 
within the category's dollar range and in no case shall the 
calculation in subclause (i)(C) result in a payment that exceeds 
the actual cost of providing an education to the student as 
determined under subclause (ii). Should the actual cost of 
providing an education to a student in Category 3 be less than 
the amount the charter school received for the student, the 
charter school shall return to the district of residence any 
overage it received for that student by no later than February 1 
of each year.
(v)  Upon submission of the report required under section 
1372(8), the charter school shall calculate the difference 
between the amount received for special education from school 
districts and the amount expended to provide special education 
programs and services. In the event the charter school's 
expenses for special education are less than the total amount it 
received from school districts for special education, the 
overpayment shall be returned to the school districts on a pro 
rata basis by no later than February 1, 2025, and February 1 of 
each year thereafter pursuant to guidelines developed by the 
department.
20250SB0354PN0292 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 * * *
Section 2.  Section 1732-A(a) of the act is amended to read:
Section 1732-A.  Provisions Applicable to Charter Schools.--
(a)  Charter schools shall be subject to the following:
Sections 108, 110, 111, 321, 325, 326, 327, 431, 436, 443, 
510, 518, 527, 708, 736, 737, 738, 739, 740, 741, 752, 753, 755, 
771, 776, 777, 808, 809, 810, 1109, 1111, 1112(a), 1301, 1310, 
1317, 1317.1, 1317.2, 1318, 1326, 1327, 1327.2, 1329, 1330, 
1332, 1333, 1333.1, 1333.2, 1333.3, 1372, 1303-A, 1513, 1517, 
1518, 1521, 1523, 1531, 1547, 2014-A, Article XIII-A and Article 
XIV.
Act of July 17, 1961 (P.L.776, No.341), known as the 
"Pennsylvania Fair Educational Opportunities Act."
Act of July 19, 1965 (P.L.215, No.116), entitled "An act 
providing for the use of eye protective devices by persons 
engaged in hazardous activities or exposed to known dangers in 
schools, colleges and universities."
Section 4 of the act of January 25, 1966 (1965 P.L.1546, 
No.541), entitled "An act providing scholarships and providing 
funds to secure Federal funds for qualified students of the 
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania who need financial assistance to 
attend postsecondary institutions of higher learning, making an 
appropriation, and providing for the administration of this 
act."
Act of July 12, 1972 (P.L.765, No.181), entitled "An act 
relating to drugs and alcohol and their abuse, providing for 
projects and programs and grants to educational agencies, other 
public or private agencies, institutions or organizations."
[Act of December 15, 1986 (P.L.1595, No.175), known as the 
"Antihazing Law."]
20250SB0354PN0292 	- 4 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 18 Pa.C.S. Ch. 28 (relating to antihazing) and 42 Pa.C.S. ยง 
5803(a)(3.1) (relating to asset forfeiture).
* * *
Section 3.  Section 1749-A(a)(1) (xlix) of the act, amended 
July 11, 2024 (P.L.618, No.55) and reenacted and amended October 
31, 2024 (P.L.1129, No.135), is amended to read:
Section 1749-A.  Applicability of other provisions of this act 
and of other acts and regulations.
(a)  General requirements.--Cyber charter schools shall be 
subject to the following:
(1)  The following:
* * *
(xlix)  Section [1372(8)] 1372.
* * *
Section 4.  This act shall take effect in 60 days.
20250SB0354PN0292 	- 5 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15