Pennsylvania 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB454 Introduced / Bill

                     
PRINTER'S NO. 380 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.454 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY MUTH, KEARNEY, HAYWOOD, COMITTA, FONTANA, HUGHES 
AND SAVAL, MARCH 17, 2025 
REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY, MARCH 17, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending the act of July 7, 1980 (P.L.380, No.97), entitled "An 
act providing for the planning and regulation of solid waste 
storage, collection, transportation, processing, treatment, 
and disposal; requiring municipalities to submit plans for 
municipal waste management systems in their jurisdictions; 
authorizing grants to municipalities; providing regulation of 
the management of municipal, residual and hazardous waste; 
requiring permits for operating hazardous waste and solid 
waste storage, processing, treatment, and disposal 
facilities; and licenses for transportation of hazardous 
waste; imposing duties on persons and municipalities; 
granting powers to municipalities; authorizing the 
Environmental Quality Board and the Department of 
Environmental Protection to adopt rules, regulations, 
standards and procedures; granting powers to and imposing 
duties upon county health departments; providing remedies; 
prescribing penalties; and establishing a fund," in general 
provisions, further providing for definitions; in 
applications and permits, further providing for permit and 
license application requirements; and making a repeal.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  The definitions of "drill cuttings" and 
"hazardous waste" in section 103 of the act of July 7, 1980 
(P.L.380, No.97), known as the Solid Waste Management Act, are 
amended to read:
Section 103.  Definitions.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27 The following words and phrases when used in this act shall 
have, unless the context clearly indicates otherwise, the 
meanings given to them in this section:
* * *
"Drill cuttings."  Rock cuttings and related mineral residues 
created during the drilling of wells pursuant to [ the act of 
December 19, 1984 (P.L.1140, No.223), known as the "Oil and Gas 
Act,"] 58 Pa.C.S. (relating to oil and gas) provided such 
materials are disposed of at the well site and pursuant to 
[section 206 of the "Oil and Gas Act." ] 58 Pa.C.S. § 3216 
(relating to well site restoration).
* * *
"Hazardous waste."  Any garbage, refuse, sludge from an 
industrial or other waste water treatment plant, sludge from a 
water supply treatment plant, or air pollution control facility , 
drilling fluids, produced waters and other wastes associated 
with the exploration, development or production of crude oil, 
natural gas or geothermal energy and other discarded material 
including solid, liquid, semisolid or contained gaseous material 
resulting from municipal, commercial, industrial, institutional, 
mining, or agricultural operations, and from community 
activities, or any combination of the above, (but does not 
include solid or dissolved material in domestic sewage, or solid 
or dissolved materials in irrigation return flows or industrial 
discharges which are point sources subject to permits under § 
402 of the Federal Water Pollution Control Act, as amended (86 
Stat. 880) or source, special nuclear, or by-product material as 
defined by the U.S. Atomic Energy Act of 1954, as amended (68 
Stat. 923)), which because of its quantity, concentration, or 
physical, chemical, or infectious characteristics may:
20250SB0454PN0380 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 (1)  cause or significantly contribute to an increase in 
mortality or an increase in morbidity in either an individual 
or the total population; or
(2)  pose a substantial present or potential hazard to 
human health or the environment when improperly treated, 
stored, transported, disposed of or otherwise managed.
The term "hazardous waste" shall not include coal refuse as 
defined in the act of September 24, 1968 (P.L.1040, No.318), 
known as the "Coal Refuse Disposal Control Act." "Hazardous 
waste" shall not include treatment sludges from coal mine 
drainage treatment plants, disposal of which is being carried on 
pursuant to and in compliance with a valid permit issued 
pursuant to the act of June 22, 1937 (P.L.1987, No.394), known 
as "The Clean Streams Law."
* * *
Section 2.  Section 502(d) of the act is amended to read:
Section 502.  Permit and license application requirements.
* * *
(d)  The application for a permit shall set forth the manner 
in which the operator plans to comply with the requirements of 
the act of June 22, 1937 (P.L.1987, No.394), known as "The Clean 
Streams Law," the act of May 31, 1945 (P.L.1198, No.418), known 
as the "Surface Mining Conservation and Reclamation Act," the 
act of January 8, 1960 (1959 P.L.2119, No.787), known as the 
"Air Pollution Control Act," and the act of November 26, 1978 
(P.L.1375, No.325), known as the "Dam Safety and Encroachments 
Act," as applicable. No approval shall be granted unless the 
plan provides for compliance with the statutes hereinabove 
enumerated, and failure to comply with the statutes hereinabove 
enumerated during construction and operation or thereafter shall 
20250SB0454PN0380 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 render the operator liable to the sanctions and penalties 
provided in this act for violations of this act and to the 
sanctions and penalties provided in the statutes hereinabove 
enumerated for violations of such statutes. Such failure to 
comply shall be cause for revocation of any approval or permit 
issued by the department to the operator. Compliance with the 
provisions of this subsection and with the provisions of this 
act and the provisions of the statutes hereinabove enumerated 
shall not relieve the operator of the responsibility for 
complying with the provisions of all other applicable statutes, 
including, but not limited to the act of [ July 17, 1961 
(P.L.659, No.339), known as the "Pennsylvania Bituminous Coal 
Mine Act,"] July 7, 2008 (P.L.654, No.55), known as the 
"Bituminous Coal Mine Safety Act," the act of November 10, 1965 
(P.L.721, No.346), known as the "Pennsylvania Anthracite Coal 
Mine Act," and the act of July 9, 1976 (P.L.931, No.178), 
entitled "An act providing emergency medical personnel; 
employment of emergency medical personnel and emergency 
communications in coal mines."
* * *
Section 3.  The provisions of 58 Pa.C.S. § 3273.1 are 
repealed insofar as they are inconsistent with the amendment of 
the definition of "hazardous waste" in section 103 of the act.
Section 4.  This act shall take effect in 60 days.
20250SB0454PN0380 	- 4 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24