Pennsylvania 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB511 Introduced / Bill

                     
PRINTER'S NO. 471 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.511 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY MASTRIANO, BAKER, BROWN, CULVER, FONTANA, HUGHES, 
HUTCHINSON, MARTIN, PENNYCUICK, PHILLIPS-HILL, STEFANO, 
STREET, TARTAGLIONE AND VOGEL, MARCH 25, 2025 
REFERRED TO VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS, 
MARCH 25, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending Title 38 (Holidays and Observances) of the Pennsylvania 
Consolidated Statutes, in veteran recognition, providing for 
Korean War Veterans Armistice Day.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  Title 38 of the Pennsylvania Consolidated 
Statutes is amended by adding a section to read:
ยง 1307.  Korean War Veterans Armistice Day.
(a)  Legislative findings and declarations.--The General 
Assembly finds and declares as follows:
(1)  The Korean War was fought in the Korean Peninsula 
from 1950 to 1953 and involved North Korea in conflict with 
South Korea supported by the United States.
(2)  The United States became involved in the Korean War 
on account of Cold War tensions promoting fear of Communism 
spreading into South Korea and throughout Asia.
(3)  On June 25, 1950, the Korean People's Army of North 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17 Korea invaded South Korea, leading to the acquisition of 
South Korea's capital, Seoul.
(4)  Following the invasion of South Korea, President 
Harry Truman ordered the United States Armed Forces to 
support South Korea on June 27, 1950, to serve as a police 
action.
(5)  On July 1, 1950, the first ground troops of the 
United States Armed Forces arrived in South Korea.
(6)  Prior to the invasion of South Korea, only 510 
troops were based in South Korea.
(7)  By 1953, a peak of approximately 326,863 troops was 
reached.
(8)  On July 27, 1953, the Korean War Armistice was 
signed, preserving the independence of North Korea and South 
Korea while maintaining a demilitarized zone between the two 
nations. A formal peace treaty was never signed.
(9)  In December 2021, South Korea, North Korea, China 
and the United States agreed to declare a formal end to the 
Korean War.
(10)  Approximately 36,000 members of the United States 
Armed Forces lost their lives in Korea, more than 92,000 were 
wounded and 8,000 were missing.
(11)  The Korean War has been referred to as the 
Forgotten War from a lack of media attention following World 
War II.
(12)  The insufficient public awareness does not allow 
the members of the United States Armed Forces who served 
bravely and faithfully for the United States to be duly 
recognized.
(13)  In 1995, the Korean War Veterans Memorial was 
20250SB0511PN0471 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 completed and dedicated in the District of Columbia to 
commemorate those members of the United States Armed Forces 
who served in Korea.
(b)  Designation.--July 27 of each year shall be designated 
as Korean War Veterans Armistice Day in this Commonwealth.
(c)  Proclamation.--The Governor shall issue annually a 
proclamation encouraging all public schools and educational 
institutions to observe Korean War Veterans Armistice Day and 
conduct exercises recognizing the contributions of all those 
involved in the Korean War and remembering the sacrifices they 
made for their country. The proclamation may not mandate a 
public school or educational institution to participate in the 
observance.
Section 2.  This act shall take effect in 60 days.
20250SB0511PN0471 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14