Pennsylvania 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB94 Introduced / Bill

                     
PRINTER'S NO. 49 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.94 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY PHILLIPS-HILL, PENNYCUICK, J. WARD, BAKER, STEFANO 
AND BROWN, JANUARY 22, 2025 
REFERRED TO FINANCE, JANUARY 22, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, 
No.1), entitled "An act providing for taxation by school 
districts, for the State funds formula, for tax relief in 
first class cities, for school district choice and voter 
participation, for other school district options and for a 
task force on school cost reduction; making an appropriation; 
prohibiting prior authorized taxation; providing for 
installment payment of taxes; restricting the power of 
certain school districts to levy, assess and collect taxes; 
and making related repeals," in senior citizens property tax 
and rent rebate assistance, further providing for 
definitions.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  The definition of "income" in section 1303 of the 
act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as 
the Taxpayer Relief Act, is amended to read:
Section 1303.  Definitions.
The following words and phrases when used in this chapter 
shall have the meanings given to them in this section unless the 
context clearly indicates otherwise:
* * *
"Income."  All income from whatever source derived, 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23 including, but not limited to:
(1)  Salaries, wages, bonuses, commissions, income from 
self-employment, alimony, support money, cash public 
assistance and relief.
(2)  The gross amount of any pensions or annuities, 
including railroad retirement benefits for calendar years 
prior to 1999 and 50% of railroad retirement benefits for 
calendar years 1999 and thereafter. For a person who receives 
a payment from a qualified plan under the Internal Revenue 
Code of 1986 (Public Law 99-514, 26 U.S.C. § 1 et seq.) and 
deposits all or a portion of the payment in another qualified 
plan under the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 within 60 days 
after receipt of the payment, the amount deposited shall be 
excluded from income.
(3)  (i) All benefits received under the Social Security 
Act (49 Stat. 620, 42 U.S.C. § 301 et seq.), except 
Medicare benefits, for calendar years prior to 1999, and 
50% of all benefits received under the Social Security 
Act, except Medicare benefits, for calendar years 1999 
and thereafter.
(ii)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this act 
to the contrary, persons who, as of December 31, 2012, 
are eligible for the property tax or rent rebate shall 
remain eligible if the household income limit is exceeded 
due solely to a Social Security cost-of-living 
adjustment.
(iii)  Eligibility in the property tax and rent 
rebate program pursuant to subparagraph (ii) shall expire 
on December 31, 2016.
(4)  All benefits received under State unemployment 
20250SB0094PN0049 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 insurance laws.
(5)  All interest received from the Federal or any state 
government or any instrumentality or political subdivision 
thereof.
(6)  Realized capital gains and rentals.
(7)  Workers' compensation.
(8)  The gross amount of loss of time insurance benefits, 
life insurance benefits and proceeds, except the first $5,000 
of the total of death benefit payments.
(9)  Gifts of cash or property, other than transfers by 
gift between members of a household, in excess of a total 
value of $300.
The term does not include surplus food or other relief in kind 
supplied by a governmental agency, property tax or rent rebate , 
inflation dividend, Federal veterans' disability payments or 
State veterans' benefits .
* * *
Section 2.  The amendment of the definition of "income" in 
section 1303 of the act shall apply to calendar years beginning 
after December 31, 2026.
Section 3.  This act shall take effect in 60 days.
20250SB0094PN0049 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21