Pennsylvania State Senator

Jay Costa Authored & Sponsored Legislation

Session

Co-Sponsor of Legislation

PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR71

Introduced
4/9/25  
Recognizing the month of April 2025 as "Alcohol Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR72

Introduced
4/9/25  
Designating March 18, 2025, as "COVID-19 Day of Remembrance" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR74

Introduced
4/4/25  
Recognizing April 19, 2025, as "Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR75

Introduced
4/4/25  
Recognizing May 15, 2025, as "Senior Fraud Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR79

Introduced
4/11/25  
Recognizing April 12, 2025, as the 161st anniversary of the Fort Pillow Massacre, in honor of the fallen soldiers who lost their lives during this battle.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR8

Introduced
1/22/25  
Urging the Governor to develop a comprehensive legislative plan to improve basic education in the public schools of this Commonwealth and to establish an advisory commission to study and make specific recommendations for components of the plan.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR80

Introduced
4/11/25  
Recognizing April 9, 2025, as "Appomattox Day" in Pennsylvania, in honor of the historic Confederate surrender in Appomattox, Virginia, which led to full emancipation in the United States and signaled the end of the American Civil War, and urging the designation of "Appomattox Day" as a legal holiday in this Commonwealth.