Wisconsin State Representative

Jerry O'Connor Authored & Sponsored Legislation

Session

Primary Sponsor of Legislation

WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR12

Introduced
3/11/25  
Refer
3/11/25  
Engrossed
4/22/25  
Honoring the life and public service of Assembly Chief Clerk Patrick Fuller.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR14

Introduced
3/11/25  
Refer
3/11/25  
Engrossed
4/22/25  
Honoring the life and public service of Representative David O. Martin.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR15

Introduced
3/11/25  
Refer
3/11/25  
Engrossed
3/20/25  
Proclaiming March 26, 2025, as Purple Day for epilepsy.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR17

Introduced
3/11/25  
Refer
3/11/25  
Engrossed
3/20/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Proclaiming the week of April 14, 2025, as Two Lights for Tomorrow Week in the state of Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR21

Introduced
4/15/25  
Designating April 2025 and April 2026 as Testicular Cancer Awareness Month in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR22

Introduced
4/15/25  
Proclaiming April 26, 2025, as Shared Parenting Day in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR24

Introduced
4/15/25  
Reaffirming Wisconsin’s commitment to the strengthening and deepening of the sister ties between the State of Wisconsin and Taiwan; reaffirming Wisconsin’s support for the Taiwan Relations Act; supporting Taiwan’s signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement with the United States; and continuing support for increasing Taiwan’s international profile.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR25

Introduced
4/15/25  
Proclaiming April 24, 2025, to be Holocaust Remembrance Day and April 27, 2025, to May 4, 2025, as Holocaust Days of Remembrance in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR29

Introduced
4/23/25  
Refer
4/23/25  
Refer
5/9/25  
Engrossed
5/13/25  
Refer
5/13/25  
Celebrating May 7, 2025, as Skilled Trades Day in Wisconsin.
WI

Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR3

Introduced
2/6/25  
Proclaiming January 2025 as Human Trafficking Awareness and Prevention Month in the state of Wisconsin.