LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
Profiles
Juan Hinojosa
Authored & Sponsored Legislation
TX
)
Texas State Senator
Juan Hinojosa
D
-
District 20
Overview
Biography
Curriculum Vitae
Legislative Sessions Info
Activity Timeline
Bill Author / Sponsor
Committee Membership
Meeting Calendar
Staff Directory
Texas State Senator
Juan Hinojosa
Authored & Sponsored Legislation
Session
89th Regular
88th 1st C.s.
88th 4th C.s.
88th 2nd C.s.
88th Regular
88th 3rd C.s.
87th 1st C.s.
87th 3rd C.s.
87th 2nd C.s.
87th Regular
86th Regular
85th 1st C.s.
85th Regular
84th Regular
83rd 2nd C.s.
83rd Regular
83rd 3rd C.s.
83rd 1st C.s.
82nd Regular
82nd 1st C.s.
81st Regular
80th Regular
79th Regular
78th Regular
77th Regular
76th Regular
75th Regular
71st Regular
70th Regular
69th Regular
68th Regular
67th Regular
Primary Author of Legislation
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR258
In memory of U.S. Congressman Sylvester Turner of Houston.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR259
Recognizing members of the Hindu faith who reside in Texas and are celebrating Holi on March 14, 2025.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR265
Recognizing March 21, 2025, as World Down Syndrome Day.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR267
Extending best wishes to all those participating in the festivities of Holi.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR269
Recognizing March 19, 2025, as Palmview Day.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR27
Recognizing February 4, 2025, as McAllen Day.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR271
Recognizing March 17, 2025, as Profound Autism Awareness Day.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR312
Recognizing Sergio Vasquez, Jesus Gonzalez, and Charlie Cavazos for assisting in fighting the 2025 wildfires in California.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR313
Recognizing March 25, 2025, as Paws Fur Help Day.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SR314
Recognizing March 21 through 26, 2025, as Marine Week Austin.
Page 22 of 25
22
23
24
25