Pennsylvania State Representative

Malcolm Kenyatta Authored & Sponsored Legislation

Session

Co-Sponsor of Legislation

PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR162

Introduced
4/1/25  
Urging all agencies of the Commonwealth to have the ability to use diacritical marks on names on all Commonwealth-issued documents by July 1, 2027.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR163

Introduced
4/1/25  
Recognizing June 14, 2025, as "World Blood Donor Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR169

Introduced
4/3/25  
Designating the month of September 2025 as "Healthy Hunger-Free Kids Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR170

Introduced
4/3/25  
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a comprehensive study of the financial impacts of pooling all school district property tax revenue at the intermediate unit level and distributing that money to school districts based on their average daily membership.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR171

Introduced
4/3/25  
Refer
4/3/25  
Designating April 24, 2025, as "Pennsylvania's Day of Remembrance of the Armenian Genocide of 1915-1923."
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR18

Introduced
1/23/25  
Designating the month of February 2025 as "Career and Technical Education Month" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR182

Introduced
4/7/25  
Recognizing the month of June 2025 as "Scleroderma Awareness Month" and June 29, 2025, as "World Scleroderma Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR189

Introduced
4/15/25  
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study on the nutritional value of food, along with the nutrition-related health of incarcerated individuals, in State correctional institutions in this Commonwealth and to issue a report of its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR19

Introduced
1/23/25  
Honoring Jacobus Franciscus "Jim" Thorpe by designating May 28, 2025, as "Jim Thorpe Day" in Pennsylvania.
PA

Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HR207

Introduced
4/23/25  
Designating the month of May 2025 as "Nurses Month" in Pennsylvania.