New York State Senator

Peter Harckham Authored & Sponsored Legislation

Session

Co-Sponsor of Legislation

NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00025

Introduced
1/9/25  
Refer
1/9/25  
Report Pass
1/14/25  
Congratulating the Brooklyn Technical High School Football Team upon the occasion of capturing the 2024-25 NYC PSAL 3A Championship on November 29, 2024
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00028

Introduced
1/9/25  
Refer
1/9/25  
Report Pass
1/14/25  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 2025, as Workplace Violence Prevention Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00033

Introduced
1/9/25  
Refer
1/9/25  
Report Pass
1/14/25  
Congratulating the Schuylerville High School Varsity Football Team and Head Coach John Bowen upon the occasion of capturing the 2024 NYSPHSAA Class C Football Championship on December 7, 2024
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00100

Introduced
1/9/25  
Refer
1/9/25  
Report Pass
1/14/25  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim February 28, 2025, as Rare Disease Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00127

Introduced
1/9/25  
Refer
1/9/25  
Report Pass
1/14/25  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 30, 2025, as Denim Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00149

Introduced
1/10/25  
Refer
1/10/25  
Report Pass
4/2/25  
Commemorating the 250th Anniversary of the Battles of Lexington and Concord on April 19, 2025, and recognizing their impact on the history of New York State

Primary Sponsor of Legislation

NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00224

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/15/25  
Report Pass
1/22/25  
Mourning the death of Celeste Alma Patton, distinguished citizen and devoted member of her community
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00225

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/15/25  
Report Pass
1/22/25  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim March 29, 2025, as Vietnam Veterans Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00226

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/15/25  
Report Pass
1/22/25  
Mourning the death of Willis H. Stephens, distinguished citizen, proud veteran, and devoted New York State Assemblyman
NY

New York 2025-2026 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00227

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/15/25  
Report Pass
1/22/25  
Mourning the death of Marie A. Paprocki, devoted mother, distinguished citizen, and dedicated member of her community