Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5231 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/25/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5231 
======== 
LC000858 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, 
PRESERVATION, DEVELO PMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULAT ION 
Introduced By: Representatives Shekarchi, and Blazejewski 
Date Introduced: January 25, 2023 
Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 139 1 
passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 2 
25, 2021, entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE 3 
COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, 4 
DEVELOPMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION" and as extended by 5 
resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and 6 
approved March 24, 2022, entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION EXTENDING THE REPORTING 7 
AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY 8 
THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT, HOUSING, 9 
ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION" is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a 10 
report to the House of Representatives on or before April 30, 2025, and said commission shall 11 
expire on June 30, 2025; and be it further  12 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 139 passed by the 13 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 25, 2021, and 14 
extended by resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 15 
A.D. 2022, and approved March 24, 2022, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 16 
======== 
LC000858 
========  
 
 
LC000858 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, 
PRESERVATION, DEVELO PMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULAT ION 
***
This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the special legislative 1 
commission to study the entire area of land use, preservation, development, housing, 2 
environment, and regulation, from June 8, 2023, to April 30, 2025, and said commission would 3 
expire on June 30, 2025. 4 
======== 
LC000858 
========