Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5522 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/10/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5522 
======== 
LC001366 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE HEALTHCARE SERVICES 
FUNDING PLAN ACT 
Introduced By: Representatives Shallcross Smith, Fenton-Fung, Hull, Cortvriend, 
Cardillo, Perez, Baginski, Noret, and Diaz 
Date Introduced: February 10, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 42-7.4-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 42-7.4 entitled "The 1 
Healthcare Services Funding Plan Act" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
42-7.4-3. Imposition of healthcare services funding contribution. 3 
(a) Each insurer is required to pay the healthcare services funding contribution for each 4 
contribution enrollee of the insurer at the time the contribution is calculated and paid, at the rate set 5 
forth in this section. 6 
(1) Beginning January 1, 2016 July 1, 2023, the secretary shall set the healthcare services 7 
funding contribution each fiscal year in an amount equal to: (i) The child immunization funding 8 
requirement described in § 23-1-46; plus (ii) The adult immunization funding requirement 9 
described in § 23-1-46; plus (iii) The children’s health services funding requirement described in § 10 
42-12-29; plus (iv) The psychiatry resource network funding requirement described in § 23-1-46.1 11 
and all as divided by (iv)(v) The number of contribution enrollees of all insurers. 12 
(2) The contribution set forth herein shall be in addition to any other fees or assessments 13 
upon the insurer allowable by law. 14 
(b) The contribution shall be paid by the insurer; provided, however, a person providing 15 
health benefits coverage on a self-insurance basis that uses the services of a third-party 16 
administrator shall not be required to make a contribution for a contribution enrollee where the 17 
contribution on that enrollee has been or will be made by the third-party administrator. 18   
 
 
LC001366 - Page 2 of 3 
(c) The secretary shall create a process to facilitate the transition to the healthcare services 1 
funding contribution method that: (i) assures adequate funding beginning July 1, 2016, (ii) reflects 2 
that funding via the healthcare services funding contribution method initially will be for only a 3 
portion of the state’s fiscal year, and (iii) avoids duplicate liability for any insurer that made a 4 
payment under the premium assessment method in effect prior to January 1, 2016, for a period for 5 
which it would also be liable for a contribution under the healthcare services funding contribution 6 
method as described in this chapter. 7 
SECTION 2. Chapter 23-1 of the General Laws entitled "Department of Health" is hereby 8 
amended by adding thereto the following section: 9 
23-1-46.1. Psychiatry resource network account (Effective July 1, 2023).     10 
(a) There is created within the general fund a restricted receipt account to be known as the 11 
"PRN account." All money in the account shall be utilized by the department of health to effectuate 12 
coverage for the following services: Existing Rhode Island lines including the PediPRN and 13 
MomsPRN information lines together with any additional information line, referral service, or 14 
hotline which is available to providers or residents in the state, and which is funded pursuant to 15 
regulation adopted by the director of the department of health. Amounts collected pursuant to § 42-16 
7.4-3(a)(1)(iv) shall be deposited in the "PRN account." The funds shall be used solely for the 17 
purposes of the "PRN account," and no other.  18 
(b) Each year's psychiatry resource network funding requirement in § 42-7.4-3(a)(1)(iv) 19 
shall be the amount:  20 
(1) Projected by the department of health for the services in subsection (a) of this section; 21 
plus  22 
(2) A ten percent (10%) contingency for unexpected expenses; and after  23 
(3) Deduction for any projected carryover of excess funds from prior assessments.  24 
(c) The department of health shall submit to the general assembly an annual report on the 25 
program and costs related to the program, on or before February 1 of each year. The department 26 
shall make available to each insurer required to make a contribution pursuant to § 42-7.4-3, upon 27 
its request, detailed information regarding the programs described in subsection (a) of this section 28 
and the costs related to those programs.  29 
(d) The "PRN account" shall be exempt from the indirect costs recovery provisions of § 30 
35-4-27.   31 
SECTION 3. This act shall take effect on July 1, 2023.  32 
======== 
LC001366 
========  
 
 
LC001366 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE HEALTHCARE SERVICES 
FUNDING PLAN ACT 
***
This act would amend Rhode Island's existing healthcare services funding plan act by 1 
adding an account relating to a new psychiatry resource network to fund Rhode Island's present 2 
PediPRN and MomsPRN, as well as similar programs which may be added by regulation in the 3 
future. It also adds an assessment to those previously authorized by the healthcare services funding 4 
plan act for purposes of funding this new account.   5 
This act would take effect on July 1, 2023.  6 
======== 
LC001366 
========