Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5630 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/15/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5630 
======== 
LC001485 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO TAXATION -- PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION TAX 
Introduced By: Representatives P. Morgan, Fenton-Fung, Rea, Nardone, Roberts, 
Azzinaro, Lima, Perez, Messier, and J. Brien 
Date Introduced: February 15, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 44-13-4 of the General Laws in Chapter 44-13 entitled "Public 1 
Service Corporation Tax" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
44-13-4. Rate of taxation. 3 
The tax imposed will be at the following rates: 4 
(1) In the case of every corporation whose principal business is a steamboat or ferryboat 5 
business as a common carrier, every common carrier steam or electric railroad corporation, every 6 
street railway corporation, every common carrier dining, sleeping, chair, or parlor car corporation, 7 
every corporation whose principal business is selling and distributing water to the public, and every 8 
toll bridge corporation, one and one-fourth percent (1.25%) of its gross earnings; 9 
(2) In the case of every corporation whose principal business is manufacturing, selling, 10 
distributing and/or transmitting currents of electricity to be used for light, heat, or motive power, 11 
four percent (4%) of its gross earnings, but deductions shall be made of gross earnings from the 12 
transmission or sale of electricity to other public utility corporations, non-regulated power 13 
producers, or municipal utilities for resale, whether within or outside of this state; provided, that 14 
the tax measured by the portion of the utility’s gross earnings as is derived from the manufacture 15 
and sale of illuminating and heating gas and its by-products and the merchandising of gas 16 
appliances shall be computed at the rate of three percent (3%); 17 
(3) In the case of every express corporation carrying on its business on steamboats, steam 18 
or electric railroads, or street railways and of every public service corporation whose principal 19   
 
 
LC001485 - Page 2 of 3 
business is that of a telegraph corporation, four percent (4%) of its gross earnings; 1 
(4) In the case of every telecommunications corporation providing telecommunications 2 
service, ten percent (10%) of its gross earnings; provided, that the rate shall be nine percent (9%) 3 
effective July 1, 1985, eight percent (8%) effective July 1, 1986, seven percent (7%) effective July 4 
1, 1987, six percent (6%) effective July 1, 1988, and five percent (5%) effective July 1, 1997. For 5 
purposes of this chapter, “telecommunications service” means the transmission of any interactive 6 
two-way electromagnetic communications including voice, image, data, and other information, by 7 
means of wire, cable, including fiber optical cable, microwave, and radio wave, or any 8 
combinations of these media. This definition does not include value added non-voice services in 9 
which computer processing applications are used to act on the form, content, code, and protocol of 10 
the information to be transmitted; and 11 
(5) In the case of every public service cable corporation, eight percent (8%) of its gross 12 
earnings;. 13 
(6) In the case of every corporation whose principal business is manufacturing, selling 14 
and/or distributing to the public illuminating or heating gas, three percent (3%) of its gross earnings. 15 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 16 
======== 
LC001485 
========  
 
 
LC001485 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO TAXATION -- PUBLIC SERVICE CORPORATION TAX 
***
This act would eliminate the gross earnings tax for every corporation whose principal 1 
business is manufacturing, selling, distributing and/or transmitting currents of electricity and 2 
natural gas to be used for light, heat, or motive power. 3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC001485 
========