Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5728 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/17/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5728 
======== 
LC001282 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO MILITARY AFFAIRS AND DEFENSE -- EXTENSION OF VETERAN S' 
BENEFITS 
Introduced By: Representatives Corvese, Azzinaro, O'Brien, and Noret 
Date Introduced: February 17, 2023 
Referred To: House Veterans` Affairs 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 30-22-5 of the General Laws in Chapter 30-22 entitled "Extension of 1 
Veterans’ Benefits" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
30-22-5. “Vietnam service” defined. 3 
“Active conduct of and/or fighting in the Vietnam Conflict” shall mean: 4 
(1) Service service by any man or woman of the armed forces of the United States between 5 
February 28, 1961, and May 7, 1975, inclusive. Provided, however, that the extension of the date 6 
from August 5, 1964, to February 28, 1961, in the definition of the Vietnam Conflict shall not 7 
entitle any veteran who served between February 28, 1961, and August 5, 1964, to any bonus 8 
previously paid; and 9 
(2) A Hmong veteran or Lao veteran who served in military operations, with special 10 
guerilla units or irregular forces, operating from a base in Laos, in support of the U.S. military, 11 
anytime between February 28, 1961, to May 7, 1975. The office of veterans' affairs shall consult 12 
with the Department of Military and Veterans' Affairs to determine the proof necessary to show 13 
that a person is a Hmong veteran or Lao veteran. 14 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 15 
======== 
LC001282 
========  
 
 
LC001282 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO MILITARY AFFAIRS AND DEFENSE -- EXTENSION OF VETERAN S' 
BENEFITS 
***
This act would include Hmong or Lao veterans who served in military operations in support 1 
of the United States during the Vietnam Conflict any time between February 28, 1961, to May 7, 2 
1975, within the definition of "active conduct of and/or fighting in the Vietnam Conflict". 3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC001282 
========