Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5793 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/22/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5793 
======== 
LC001999 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO EDUCATION -- FOUNDATION LEVEL SCHOOL SUPPORT 
Introduced By: Representatives Giraldo, Alzate, Morales, Cruz, and Potter 
Date Introduced: February 22, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 16-7-41.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 16-7 entitled "Foundation 1 
Level School Support [See Title 16 Chapter 97 — The Rhode Island Board of Education Act]" is 2 
hereby amended to read as follows: 3 
16-7-41.1. Eligibility for reimbursement. 4 
(a) School districts, not municipalities, may apply for and obtain approval for a project 5 
under the necessity of school construction process set forth in the regulations of the council on 6 
elementary and secondary education, provided, however, in the case of a municipality that issues 7 
bonds through the Rhode Island health and educational building corporation to finance or refinance 8 
school facilities for a school district that is not part of the municipality, the municipality may apply 9 
for and obtain approval for a project. Such approval will remain valid until June 30 of the third 10 
fiscal year following the fiscal year in which the council on elementary and secondary education’s 11 
approval is granted. Only those projects undertaken at school facilities under the care and control 12 
of the school committee and located on school property may qualify for reimbursement under §§ 13 
16-7-35 — 16-7-47. Facilities with combined school and municipal uses or facilities that are 14 
operated jointly with any other profit or nonprofit agency do not qualify for reimbursement under 15 
§§ 16-7-35 — 16-7-47. Projects completed by June 30 of a fiscal year are eligible for 16 
reimbursement in the following fiscal year. A project for new school housing or additional housing 17 
shall be deemed to be completed when the work has been officially accepted by the school 18 
committee or when the housing is occupied for its intended use by the school committee, whichever 19   
 
 
LC001999 - Page 2 of 4 
is earlier. 1 
(b) Notwithstanding the provisions of this section, the board of regents shall not grant final 2 
approval for any project between June 30, 2011, and May 1, 2015, except for projects that are 3 
necessitated by immediate health and safety reasons. In the event that a project is requested during 4 
the moratorium because of immediate health and safety reasons, those proposals shall be reported 5 
to the chairs of the house and senate finance committees. 6 
(c) Any project approval granted prior to the adoption of the school construction 7 
regulations in 2007, and which are currently inactive; and any project approval granted prior to the 8 
adoption of the school construction regulations in 2007 which did not receive voter approval or 9 
which has not been previously financed, are no longer eligible for reimbursement under this 10 
chapter. The department of elementary and secondary education shall develop recommendations 11 
for further cost containment strategies in the school housing aid program. 12 
(d) Beginning July 1, 2015, the council on elementary and secondary education shall 13 
approve new necessity of school construction applications on an annual basis. The department of 14 
elementary and secondary education shall develop an annual application timeline for local 15 
education agencies seeking new necessity of school construction approvals. 16 
(e) Beginning July 1, 2019, no state funding shall be provided for projects in excess of ten 17 
million dollars ($10,000,000) unless the prime contractor for the project has received 18 
prequalification from the school building authority. 19 
(f) Beginning July 1, 2019, the necessity of school construction process set forth in the 20 
regulations of the council on elementary and secondary education shall include a single statewide 21 
process, developed with the consultation of the department of environmental management, that will 22 
ensure community involvement throughout the investigation and remediation of contaminated 23 
building sites for possible reuse as the location of a school. That process will fulfill all provisions 24 
of § 23-19.14-5 related to the investigation of reuse of such sites for schools. 25 
(g) Beginning July 1, 2019, school housing projects exceeding one million five hundred 26 
thousand dollars ($1,500,000) subject to inflation shall include an owner’s program manager and a 27 
commissioning agent. The cost of the program manager and commissioning agent shall be 28 
considered a project cost eligible for aid pursuant to §§ 16-7-41 and 16-105-5. 29 
(h) Temporary housing, or swing space, for students shall be a reimbursable expense so 30 
long as a district can demonstrate that no other viable option to temporarily house students exists 31 
and provided that use of the temporary space is time limited for a period not to exceed twenty-four 32 
(24) months and tied to a specific construction project. 33 
(i) Environmental site remediation, as defined by the school building authority, shall be a 34   
 
 
LC001999 - Page 3 of 4 
reimbursable expense up to one million dollars ($1,000,000) per project. 1 
(j) If, within thirty (30) years of construction, a newly constructed school is sold to a private 2 
entity, the state shall receive a portion of the sale proceeds equal to that project’s housing aid 3 
reimbursement rate at the time of project completion. 4 
(k) All projects must comply with § 37-13-6, ensuring that prevailing wage laws are being 5 
followed, and § 37-14.1-6, ensuring that minority business enterprises reach a minimum of ten 6 
percent (10%) of the dollar value of the bid. The school housing aid ratio shall be increased by five 7 
percent (5%) for projects that ensure Rhode Island based minority business enterprises reach a 8 
minimum of twenty percent (20%) of the dollar value of the bid. 9 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 10 
======== 
LC001999 
========  
 
 
LC001999 - Page 4 of 4 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO EDUCATION -- FOUNDATION LEVEL SCH OOL SUPPORT 
***
This act would require that the school housing aid ratio shall be increased by five percent 1 
(5%) for projects that ensure Rhode Island based minority business enterprises reach a minimum 2 
of twenty percent (20%) of the dollar value of the bid. 3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC001999 
========