Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5946 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/30/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5946 SUBSTITUTE A 
======== 
LC002194/SUB A 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO STATE AFFAIRS IN GOVERNMEN T -- LEAD HAZARD MITIGATION 
Introduced By: Representatives Voas, Giraldo, O'Brien, Morales, Casimiro, DeSimone, 
Solomon, and Kazarian 
Date Introduced: March 01, 2023 
Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 42-128.1-8 of the General Laws in Chapter 42-128.1 entitled "Lead 1 
Hazard Mitigation" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
42-128.1-8. Duties of property owners of pre-1978 rental dwellings. 3 
(a) Property owners of pre-1978 rental dwellings, which have not been made lead safe or 4 
have not been lead hazard abated shall comply with all the following requirements: 5 
(1) Learn about lead hazards by taking a lead hazard awareness seminar, himself or herself 6 
or through a designated person; 7 
(2) Evaluate the dwelling unit and premises for lead hazards consistent with the 8 
requirements for a lead hazard control evaluation; 9 
(3) Correct identified lead hazards by meeting and maintaining the lead hazard mitigation 10 
standard; 11 
(4) Provide tenants: (i) basic information about lead hazard control; (ii) a copy of the 12 
independent clearance inspection; and (iii) information about how to give notice of deteriorating 13 
conditions; 14 
(5) Correct lead hazards within thirty (30) days after notification from the tenant of a 15 
dwelling unit with an at risk occupant, or as provided for by § 34-18-22. 16 
(b) New property owners of a pre-1978 rental dwelling that is occupied by an at risk 17 
occupant shall have up to sixty (60) days to meet requirements for lead hazard mitigation, if those 18 
requirements were not met by the previous owner at the time of transfer, provided that the new 19   
 
 
LC002194/SUB A - Page 2 of 3 
property owner has the property visually inspected within thirty (30) business days after assuming 1 
ownership to determine conformity with the lead hazard control standard. 2 
(c) The requirements for lead hazard mitigation shall apply to the first change in ownership 3 
or tenancy after November 1, 2005; provided further, that unless requested and agreed to by an at-4 
risk occupant, meeting the lead hazard mitigation standard shall not be construed to authorize a 5 
property owner to compel or cause a person, who is in tenancy on January 1, 2004, and remains in 6 
tenancy continuously thereafter, to vacate a rental unit temporarily or otherwise. 7 
(d) If the tenant receives no response to the notification to the property owner of 8 
deteriorating conditions affecting lead hazards, if the response is in the tenant’s opinion 9 
unsatisfactory, or if the remedy performed is in the tenant’s opinion unsatisfactory, the tenant may 10 
request a review of the matter by the housing resources commission. After its review of the matter, 11 
the housing resources commission shall either send notice to the property owner in which notice 12 
shall be issued in a manner substantially similar to a notice of violation issued by the director 13 
pursuant to the Housing Maintenance Code, chapter 24.3 of title 45, or promptly inform the tenant 14 
of the reasons why the notice is not being issued. 15 
(e) Notwithstanding the foregoing, the provisions of this chapter shall not apply to common 16 
areas in condominium complexes that are owned and operated by condominium associations, or to 17 
pre-1978 rental dwelling units that are: 18 
(1) Lead-safe or lead free; or 19 
(2) Temporary housing; or 20 
(3) Elderly housing; or. 21 
(4) Comprised of two (2) or three (3) units, one of which is occupied by the property owner; 22 
or 23 
(f) The department of health shall report to the legislature annually on the number of 24 
children who are lead poisoned in any of the exempted dwelling units as referred to in subdivision 25 
subsection (e)(4) of this section. 26 
(g) Nothing contained herein shall be construed to prevent an owner who is seeking to 27 
obtain lead liability insurance coverage in the policy from complying with the provisions of this 28 
chapter, by securing and maintaining a valid and in force letter of compliance or conformance in 29 
force. 30 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect on January 1, 2024. 31 
======== 
LC002194/SUB A 
========  
 
 
LC002194/SUB A - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO STATE AFFAIRS IN GOVERNMENT -- LEAD HAZARD MITIGATION 
***
This act would require that property owners implement lead hazard mitigation for pre-1978 1 
rental dwelling units that are comprised of two (2) or three (3) units, one of which is occupied by 2 
the property owner.  3 
This act would take effect on January 1, 2024.  4 
======== 
LC002194/SUB A 
========