Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6014 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/01/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6014 
======== 
LC001916 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO TAXATION -- STATEWIDE TANGIBLE PROPERTY TA X EXEMPTION 
Introduced By: Representatives Rea, Shallcross Smith, Chippendale, Newberry, Place, 
Nardone, Sanchez, McNamara, Noret, and Cardillo 
Date Introduced: March 01, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Title 44 of the General Laws entitled "TAXATION" is hereby amended by 1 
adding thereto the following chapter: 2 
CHAPTER 5.3 3 
STATEWIDE TANGIBLE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTION 4 
44-5.3-1. Statewide tangible property tax exemption.     5 
(a) Notwithstanding the provisions of chapter 5 of this title or any other provisions to the 6 
contrary, in an effort to provide relief for businesses, including small businesses, and to promote 7 
economic development, all ratable, tangible personal property not otherwise exempt from taxation 8 
shall be exempt from taxation up to and including the amount of assessed value set forth in 9 
subsection (b) of this section. 10 
(b) The exemption provided in subsection (a) of this section shall be up to and including 11 
the following amounts: 12 
(1) Five thousand dollars ($5,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 2024; 13 
(2) Twenty thousand dollars ($20,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 2025; 14 
(3) Fifty thousand dollars ($50,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 2026; 15 
(4) One hundred thousand dollars ($100,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 16 
2027; 17 
(5) Two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) for the tax year ending on December 18 
31, 2028. 19   
 
 
LC001916 - Page 2 of 3 
(c) Beginning in fiscal year 2025 and for each fiscal year through fiscal year 2029, cities, 1 
towns, and fire districts shall receive reimbursements, as set forth in this section, from state general 2 
revenues equal to the amount of lost tax revenues due to the reduction of the tangible property tax 3 
in the respective fiscal year as a result of the corresponding exemption set forth in subsections (a) 4 
and (b) of this section.  5 
(d) Beginning in fiscal year 2029, all ratable, tangible personal property assessed at less 6 
than two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000), shall be exempt from taxation. 7 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 8 
======== 
LC001916 
========  
 
 
LC001916 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO TAXATION -- STATEWIDE TANGIBLE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTIO N 
***
This act would phase in an exemption from taxation of all ratable, tangible personal 1 
property of businesses, up to a maximum assessed value of two hundred fifty thousand dollars 2 
($250,000), over a five (5) year period, at which time, the maximum exemption would become 3 
permanent. This act would also provide for cities, towns, and fire districts to receive reimbursement 4 
from state general revenues equal to the amount of lost tax revenues due to the exemption. 5 
This act would take effect upon passage. 6 
======== 
LC001916 
========