Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6188 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/22/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6188 
======== 
LC002573 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO HUMAN SE RVICES -- QUALITY SELF-DIRECTED SERVICES 
Introduced By: Representatives Slater, Diaz, Cruz, Potter, O'Brien, Corvese, Edwards, 
Giraldo, Voas, and Solomon 
Date Introduced: March 22, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Chapter 40-8.14 of the General Laws entitled "Quality Self-Directed 1 
Services" is hereby amended by adding thereto the following section: 2 
40-8.14-4.1. Compensation rates for individual providers of direct support services. 3 
In accordance with the secretary's authority under ยง 40-8.14-4(c)(1), the hourly 4 
compensation rates for "individual providers" shall be no less than sixteen dollars ($16.00) per hour 5 
beginning April 1, 2023; increasing to no less than seventeen dollars ($17.00) per hour on June 30, 6 
2023; increasing to no less than eighteen dollars ($18.00) per hour on December 31, 2023 and no 7 
less than nineteen dollars ($19.00) per hour on June 30, 2024, and continuing.   8 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 9 
======== 
LC002573 
========  
 
 
LC002573 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO HUMAN SE RVICES -- QUALITY SELF-DIRECTED SERVICES 
***
This act would increase the hourly compensation for "individual providers" from no less 1 
than sixteen dollars ($16.00) on April 1, 2023, and gradually increase several times until June 30, 2 
2024, when it would be nineteen dollars ($19.00) and continuing.   3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC002573 
========