Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6282 Introduced / Bill

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6282 
======== 
LC002737 
======== 
S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
PROCLAIMING APRIL 24, 2023, AS "ARMENIAN GENOCIDE REMEMBRANCE DAY" 
TO COMMEMORATE THE A RMENIAN GENOCIDE OF 1915 TO 1923, AND IN HONOR 
OF ARMENIAN-AMERICANS 
Introduced By: Representatives Kazarian, Shekarchi, Blazejewski, Corvese, 
Chippendale, Solomon, Potter, Baginski, Edwards, and Fellela 
Date Introduced: April 18, 2023 
Referred To: House read and passed 
 
 
WHEREAS, The Armenian Genocide was conceived and carried out by the Ottoman 1 
Empire from 1915 to 1923, and resulted in the deportation of nearly 2,000,000 Armenians, of 2 
whom 1,500,000 men, women, and children were killed, and the remaining 500,000 survived but 3 
were expelled from their homes. This act succeeded in the elimination of the Armenians from 4 
their historic ancestral homeland where they had resided for over 2,500 years; and 5 
WHEREAS, On May 24, 1915, for the first time ever, the Allied Powers of England, 6 
France, and Russia, jointly issued a statement explicitly charging another government of 7 
committing "a crime against humanity"; and 8 
WHEREAS, This joint statement declared, "the Allied Governments announce publicly 9 
to the Sublime Porte that they will hold personally responsible for these crimes all members of 10 
the Ottoman Government, as well as those of their agents who are implicated in such massacres"; 11 
and 12 
WHEREAS, United States Ambassador Henry Morgenthau, Sr. explicitly described the 13 
policy of the Ottoman Empire's government to the United States Department of State as "a 14 
campaign of race extermination," and on July 16, 1915, was informed by United States Secretary 15 
of State Robert Lansing that the "Department approves your procedure . . . to stop Armenian 16 
persecution"; and 17 
WHEREAS, The post-World War I Turkish government indicted the top leaders involved 18 
in the organization and execution of the Armenian Genocide and in the "massacre and destruction 19   
 
 
LC002737 - Page 2 of 3 
of the Armenians," and in a series of court-martials, officials of the Young Turk regime were 1 
charged, tried and convicted, for organizing and executing massacres against the Armenian 2 
people; and 3 
WHEREAS, In 1948, the United Nations War Crimes Commission invoked the 4 
Armenian Genocide as "precisely . . . one of the types of acts which the modern term 'crimes 5 
against humanity' is intended to cover" as a precedent for the Nuremberg tribunals; and  6 
WHEREAS, The United States National Archives and Record Administration holds 7 
extensive and thorough documentation on the Armenian Genocide, especially in its holdings 8 
under Record Group 59 of the United States Department of State, files 867.00 and 867.40, which 9 
are open and widely available to the public and interested institutions; and 10 
WHEREAS, The United States Holocaust Memorial Council, an independent federal 11 
agency, unanimously resolved on April 30, 1981, that the United States Holocaust Memorial 12 
Museum would include the Armenian Genocide in the museum and has since done so; and  13 
WHEREAS, When one enters the United States Holocaust Memorial Museum, there is an 14 
exhibit depicting Adolf Hitler, who on ordering his military commanders to attack Poland without 15 
provocation in 1939, dismissed objections by stating "[w]ho, after all, speaks today of the 16 
annihilation of the Armenians?", thus setting the stage for the Holocaust; and 17 
WHEREAS, On April 24, 2021, United States President Joe Biden stated, "…we 18 
remember the lives of all those who have died in the Ottoman-era Armenian genocide and 19 
recommit ourselves to preventing such an atrocity from ever again occurring"; and  20 
WHEREAS, In 1918, after the fall of the Russian Empire, the Azerbaijan Democratic 21 
Republic and the First Republic of Armenia both declared independence; however, shortly 22 
thereafter, they became part of the Soviet Union. The modern Republic of Azerbaijan once again 23 
proclaimed its independence in August of 1991, shortly before the dissolution of the USSR. 24 
Within its borders, however, the predominantly Armenian enclave known as the Republic of 25 
Artsakh officially voted to become part of Armenia; and 26 
WHEREAS, Azerbaijan sought to suppress the separatist movement, while Armenia 27 
backed it. Turkey has close ties to Azerbaijan and was the first nation to recognize Azerbaijan's 28 
independence in 1991. In 1993, Turkey, in addition to engaging in numerous hostilities, shut its 29 
border with Armenia in support of Azerbaijan during the war over the Republic of Artsakh; and 30 
WHEREAS, In Turkey's continuing aggression and genocide of Armenians that began 31 
more than 100 years ago, the 2020 unprovoked war between Azerbaijan, with military support 32 
provided by Turkey, and the Republic of Artsakh has resulted in Artsakh being forced to return 33 
many of the surrounding territories it had occupied for millennia; and  34   
 
 
LC002737 - Page 3 of 3 
WHEREAS, Beginning in May of 2021, Azerbaijan has been making armed incursions 1 
into, and taking lands within, Armenian's internationally recognized borders including in the 2 
Syunik and Gegharkunik provinces; and   3 
WHEREAS, In March through early April of 2022, following several days of escalated 4 
tensions, Azerbaijan’s military open fired on Armenian military posts along the western part of 5 
the Armenia-Azerbaijan border, and days later, shelled various villages, mostly located along the 6 
eastern border of Artsakh; and 7 
WHEREAS, Currently, there are no diplomatic relations between Armenia and 8 
Azerbaijan, and the Nagorno-Karabakh conflict has continued to ignite clashes and casualties as 9 
recently as March of 2023; now, therefor be it 10 
RESOLVED, That this House of Representatives of the State of Rhode Island hereby 11 
recognizes April 24, 2023, as "Armenian Genocide Remembrance Day" in the State of Rhode 12 
Island; and be it further 13 
RESOLVED, That this House hereby respectfully requests the President of the United 14 
States and the United States Congress to call on the government of Turkey to face history and 15 
acknowledge this crime of genocide committed by the Ottoman Turks in 1915, and urge the 16 
Turkish government to make restitution for the loss of lives, confiscated properties, and general 17 
unlawful deportations, separating the indigenous population from their homeland; and be it 18 
further 19 
RESOLVED, That this House expresses its deepest sympathy to the Armenian-American 20 
community of Rhode Island and assures them that this genocide will always be commemorated 21 
and never forgotten; and be it further 22 
RESOLVED, That the Secretary of State be and hereby is authorized and directed to 23 
transmit duly certified copies of this resolution to the Honorable Joseph Biden, President of the 24 
United States, the Rhode Island Congressional Delegation, the Governor of the State of Rhode 25 
Island, the Armenian Assembly of America in Washington, and the Armenian National 26 
Committee in Washington. 27 
======== 
LC002737 
========