Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6373 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/05/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6373 
======== 
LC002956 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF 
THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPER TIES 
AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE 
ASSOCIATED EXPENSES 
Introduced By: Representatives Noret, Casimiro, and Costantino 
Date Introduced: May 05, 2023 
Referred To: House State Government & Elections 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 295 1 
passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved May 12, 2 
2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission To Study and 3 
Review the Cost and Status of the State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned 4 
Properties and Provide Recommendations for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" is 5 
hereby authorized to continue its study and make a report to the House of Representatives on or 6 
before May 31, 2024, and said commission shall expire on June 30, 2024; and be it further 7 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 295 passed by the 8 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved May 12, 2022, be and 9 
the same is hereby rescinded. 10 
======== 
LC002956 
========  
 
 
LC002956 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF 
THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPER TIES 
AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE 
ASSOCIATED EXPENSES 
***
This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the special legislative 1 
commission to study and review the cost and status of the State of Rhode Island owned, vacant, 2 
and abandoned properties and provide recommendations for methods to mitigate the associated 3 
expenses, from May 1, 2023, to May 31, 2024, and said commission would expire on June 30, 4 
2024. 5 
======== 
LC002956 
========