Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6477 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/02/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6477 
======== 
LC003125 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO EDUCATION -- APPRENTICESHIP PATHWAYS TO EARNING A 
BACHELOR'S DEGREE ACT 
Introduced By: Representatives McNamara, Giraldo, Sanchez, Potter, Cruz, and Boylan 
Date Introduced: June 02, 2023 
Referred To: House Education 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Title 16 of the General Laws entitled "EDUCATION" is hereby amended by 1 
adding thereto the following chapter: 2 
CHAPTER 112 3 
APPRENTICESHIP PATHWAYS TO EARNING A BACHELOR'S DEGREE ACT 4 
16-112-1. Short title.  5 
This chapter shall be known and may be cited as the “Apprenticeship Pathways to Earning 6 
a Bachelor’s Degree Act.” 7 
16-112-2. Definitions.  8 
As used in this section: 9 
(1) “Apprenticeship” means an apprenticeship program that meets the standards 10 
established in the National Apprenticeship Act 29 CFR Part 29, and that is registered with the 11 
department of labor and training. 12 
(2) “Board” means the board of education. 13 
16-112-3. Implementation.  14 
(a) By January 1, 2024, each state public higher education institution shall adopt policies 15 
establishing nontraditional pathways to earning a bachelor’s degree at the state's public higher 16 
education institutions through the inclusion of credits earned through apprenticeships, as further 17 
provided in subsection (e) of this section. 18   
 
 
LC003125 - Page 2 of 4 
(b) The policies adopted by each higher education institution shall be subject to review and 1 
approval of the board of education. The board shall reject or modify any policies that are unduly 2 
burdensome for students seeking the apprenticeship pathway to earning a bachelor’s degree. This 3 
review shall be completed by April 1, 2024. 4 
(c) In addition, the board of education shall adopt policies to uniformly address the 5 
following: 6 
(1) The form and manner in which registered apprenticeships may be determined to be 7 
eligible for inclusion in a nontraditional pathway to earning a bachelor's degree, including through 8 
public-private partnerships or an application process. 9 
(d) No later than September 1, 2024, the board shall convene a workgroup, including, but 10 
not limited to, representatives from the department of labor and training, the office of the 11 
postsecondary commissioner, public higher education institutions, the state apprenticeship council, 12 
and the construction trades. The purpose of the workgroup is to advise the board regarding the 13 
implementation of nontraditional pathways to earning a bachelor’s degree, including assisting with 14 
the review pursuant to subsection (b) of this section and with the development of the plan required 15 
by 16-112-4. 16 
(e) The policies that shall be adopted by each public higher education institution shall 17 
include, but not be limited to: 18 
(1) The process by which a student may request academic credit for registered 19 
apprenticeship coursework and experience;  20 
(2) The number of credits a student may earn through coursework and experience hours in 21 
a registered apprenticeship; 22 
(3) The development of clear guidelines distinguishing credit-bearing and non-credit-23 
bearing apprenticeship coursework including, but not limited to, standardizing the process of 24 
assigning credit to apprenticeship coursework; and 25 
(4) Guidelines to determine degree majors towards which credits for apprenticeships may 26 
be earned, including giving priority to majors that have both a low completion rate and a hiring 27 
need by employers existing in the state. 28 
(f) The policies of the public higher education institutions adopted pursuant to this section 29 
shall become effective beginning August 1,2024. 30 
16-112-4. Reporting.  31 
No later than August 1, 2025, the board shall provide the governor, the president of the 32 
senate, and the speaker of the house of representatives a plan for increasing the number of students 33 
who earn credit towards and/or complete bachelor's degrees from a Rhode Island public institution 34   
 
 
LC003125 - Page 3 of 4 
of higher education through a registered apprenticeship. The board may create additional reporting 1 
requirements to focus on data collection for the purposes of program progress, goals, and 2 
participation. 3 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC003125 
========  
 
 
LC003125 - Page 4 of 4 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO EDUCATION -- APPRENTICESHIP PATHW AYS TO EARNING A 
BACHELOR'S DEGREE ACT 
***
This act would create the Apprenticeship Pathways to Earning a Bachelor’s Degree Act, to 1 
enable an individual to earn a bachelor’s degree at public higher education institutions throughout 2 
the state by earning credits through apprenticeships. 3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC003125 
========