Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6488 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/06/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6488 
======== 
LC003159 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
J O I N T   R E S O L U T I O N 
MAKING AN APPROPRIATION TO PAY CERTAIN CLAIMS 
Introduced By: Representative Marvin L. Abney 
Date Introduced: June 06, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
RESOLVED, That there is hereby appropriated out of any money in the treasury not 1 
otherwise appropriated for the fiscal year 2023-2024 the sums stipulated to pay the claims of the 2 
following: 3 
                              Representative John G. Edwards 4 
The sum of $1,000.00 to pay the claim of Mark Wolff of 51 Blackbird Street, Tiverton, 5 
RI 02878, for damages to his vehicle when it was struck by roadway debris while traveling south 6 
on route 95, south of Thurbers Avenue underneath the Eddy Street overpass on or about May 13, 7 
2022 in the City of Providence; 8 
                             Representative Patricia A. Serpa 9 
The sum of $1,077.00 to pay the claim of William Rainville of 149 Burlingame Road, 10 
Warwick, RI 02893, for damages to his vehicle when it struck a roadway defect while traveling 11 
on Elmwood Avenue at or near Park Avenue in the City of Cranston on or about October 5, 2022; 12 
Representative Susan R. Donovan 13 
The sum of $283.98 to pay the claim of John J. O’Brien of 11 Belcourt Avenue, Bristol, 14 
RI 02809, for damages to his vehicle when it struck a roadway defect while traveling on route 15 
136 in the Town of Warren on or about April 3, 2023; 16 
                            Representative Arthur J. Corvese   17 
The sum of $742.59 to pay the claim of Karen A. Cortelessa of 51 Thelma Street, North 18 
Providence, RI 02904, for damages to her vehicle when it struck a roadway defect while traveling 19 
on Douglas Avenue at or near Town Fair Tire on or about January 6, 2023; and the state 20   
 
 
LC003159 - Page 2 of 3 
controller is hereby authorized and directed to draw his orders upon the General Treasurer for the 1 
payment of said funds. 2 
======== 
LC003159 
========  
 
 
LC003159 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
J O I N T   R E S O L U T I O N 
MAKING AN APPROPRIAT ION TO PAY CERTAIN CLAIMS 
***
This resolution would authorize the appropriation to pay claims of the following:  1 
 Representative John G. Edwards  2 
The sum of $1,000.00 to pay the claim of Mark Wolff of 51 Blackbird Street, Tiverton, 3 
RI 02878; 4 
 Representative Patricia A. Serpa 5 
The sum of $1,077.00 to pay the claim of William Rainville of 149 Burlingame Road, 6 
Warwick, RI 02893; 7 
Representative Susan R. Donovan 8 
The sum of $283.98 to pay the claim of John J. O’Brien of 11 Belcourt Avenue, Bristol, 9 
RI 02809; 10 
 Representative Arthur J. Corvese    11 
The sum of $742.59 to pay the claim of Karen A. Cortelessa of 51 Thelma Street, North 12 
Providence, RI 02904. 13 
======== 
LC003159 
========