Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0220 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- S 0220 
======== 
LC001522 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO TOWNS AN D CITIES -- STATE AID 
Introduced By: Senators E Morgan, Rogers, de la Cruz, Paolino, DeLuca, and Raptakis 
Date Introduced: February 16, 2023 
Referred To: Senate Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 45-13-5.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 45-13 entitled "State Aid" 1 
is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
45-13-5.1. General assembly appropriations in lieu of property tax from certain 3 
exempt private and state properties. 4 
(a) In lieu of the amount of local real property tax on real property owned by any private 5 
nonprofit institution of higher education, or any nonprofit hospital facility, or any state owned and 6 
operated hospital, veterans’ residential facility, or correctional facility occupied by more than one 7 
hundred (100) residents which may have been or will be exempted from taxation by applicable 8 
state law, exclusive of any facility operated by the federal government, the state of Rhode Island, 9 
or any of its subdivisions, the general assembly shall annually appropriate for payment to the 10 
several cities and towns in which the property lies a sum equal to twenty-seven percent (27%) of 11 
all tax that would have been collected had the real property been taxable; provided, however, said 12 
percentage shall be subject to adjustment pursuant to subsection (e) of this section; and provided 13 
further, that such annual payment shall also apply to any and all real estate owned by the state 14 
within the town of Exeter, notwithstanding the restrictions set forth in this section. 15 
(b) In no event shall any city or town record in a fiscal year both: (1) Taxes and/or payments 16 
under a stabilization agreement with a for-profit hospital facility; and (2) Distributions of 17 
appropriations under this section attributable to the prior nonprofit status of said for-profit hospital 18 
facility. 19   
 
 
LC001522 - Page 2 of 4 
(c) As used in this section, “private nonprofit institution of higher education” means any 1 
institution engaged primarily in education beyond the high school level, the property of which is 2 
exempt from property tax under any of the subdivisions, and “nonprofit hospital facility” means 3 
any nonprofit hospital licensed by the state and which is used for the purpose of general medical, 4 
surgical, or psychiatric care and treatment. 5 
(d) The grant payable to any municipality under the provision of this section shall be equal 6 
to twenty-seven percent (27%) of the property taxes that, except for any exemption to any 7 
institution of higher education or general hospital facility, would have been paid with respect to 8 
that exempt real property on the assessment list in the municipality for the assessment date of 9 
December 31, 1986, and with respect to such exempt real property appearing on an assessment list 10 
in the municipality on succeeding assessment dates. Provided, however, that the grant paid for the 11 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2008, shall be based upon the assessment list in the municipality as of 12 
December 31, 2004. 13 
(e) The state budget offices shall include the amount of the annual appropriation in the state 14 
budget for the fiscal year commencing July 1, 1988, and each fiscal year thereafter. The amount of 15 
the annual distribution of appropriation payable to each eligible municipality in any year in 16 
accordance with this section shall be reduced proportionately in the event that the total of the annual 17 
appropriation in the state budget is insufficient to pay the eligible municipalities the amounts 18 
otherwise payable to said communities pursuant to subsection (a) of this section. 19 
(f) Distribution of appropriations shall be made by the state on or before July 31 of 1988 20 
and each July 31 thereafter or following verified receipt of a municipality’s assessment data for the 21 
following fiscal year’s payment, whichever is later, and the payments may be counted as a 22 
receivable by any city or town for a fiscal year ending the preceding June 30. 23 
(g) Any act or omission by the state with respect to this chapter shall in no way diminish 24 
the duty of any town or municipality to provide public safety or other ordinary services to the 25 
properties or facilities of the type listed in subsection (a). Such duty shall not pertain to the town of 26 
Exeter unless, and until such time as, it establishes a municipal police department. 27 
(h) Provided, that payments authorized pursuant to this section shall be initially applied to 28 
create a municipal police force in any community that does not have such a service on the effective 29 
date of this subsection, or to defray negotiated amounts paid by such municipality to the state for 30 
state police presence and coverage within that municipality and thereafter, such payments shall be 31 
reduced pro rata, for that period of time that the municipality or local districts located therein 32 
suspends or reduces such essential services to eligible facilities. For the purposes of this section 33 
“essential services” include, but are not to be limited to, police, fire and rescue. 34   
 
 
LC001522 - Page 3 of 4 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 1 
======== 
LC001522 
========  
 
 
LC001522 - Page 4 of 4 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO TOWNS AN D CITIES -- STATE AID 
***
This act would secure general assembly appropriations in lieu of property taxes for state-1 
owned properties within the town of Exeter. 2 
This act would take effect upon passage. 3 
======== 
LC001522 
========