South Carolina 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H4303 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/01/2025

                    South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026

Bill 4303

Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter

(Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)

Indicates Matter Stricken Indicates New Matter   Amended May 1, 2025   H. 4303   Introduced by Reps. Gatch, Cobb-Hunter, Sessions, M. M. Smith, Brewer, Rutherford, Gagnon, Guest, Guffey, Weeks, Hosey and Yow    S. Printed 5/1/25--H. Read the first time April 3, 2025   ________

Indicates Matter Stricken

Indicates New Matter

Amended

May 1, 2025

H. 4303

Introduced by Reps. Gatch, Cobb-Hunter, Sessions, M. M. Smith, Brewer, Rutherford, Gagnon, Guest, Guffey, Weeks, Hosey and Yow

S. Printed 5/1/25--H.

Read the first time April 3, 2025

________

A bill   TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 12-21-620, RELATING TO TAX RATES ON PRODUCTS CONTAINING TOBACCO, SO AS TO TAX CIGARETTES FOR HEATING ONE AND ONE-QUARTER mills ON EACH CIGARETTE.     Amend Title To Conform   Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina:   SECTION 1.  Section 12-21-620 of the S.C. Code is amended to read:       Section 12-21-620. (A) There shall be levied, assessed, collected, and paid in respect to the articles containing tobacco enumerated in this section the following amounts:        (1) upon all cigarettes for smoking made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, three and one-half mills on each cigarette;        (2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, fourteen and one-quarter mills on each cigarette;        (2)(3) upon all tobacco products, as defined in Section 12-21-800, five percent of the manufacturer's price.     Manufacturer's price as used in this section is the established price at which a manufacturer sells to a wholesaler.     (B) As used in this section, "cigarette" means:        (1) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco wrapped in paper or in any substance other than a tobacco leaf; or        (2) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, wrapped in any substance, weighing three pounds per thousand or less, however labeled or named, which because of its appearance, size, type of tobacco used in the filler, or its packaging, pricing, marketing, or labeling, is likely to be offered to, or purchased by, consumers as a cigarette described in item (1) of this subsection.   SECTION 2.  This act takes effect October 1, 2025. ----XX----

A bill

TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 12-21-620, RELATING TO TAX RATES ON PRODUCTS CONTAINING TOBACCO, SO AS TO TAX CIGARETTES FOR HEATING ONE AND ONE-QUARTER mills ON EACH CIGARETTE.

Amend Title To Conform

Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina:

SECTION 1.  Section 12-21-620 of the S.C. Code is amended to read:

Section 12-21-620. (A) There shall be levied, assessed, collected, and paid in respect to the articles containing tobacco enumerated in this section the following amounts:

(1) upon all cigarettes for smoking made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, three and one-half mills on each cigarette;

(2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, fourteen and one-quarter mills on each cigarette;

(2)(3) upon all tobacco products, as defined in Section 12-21-800, five percent of the manufacturer's price.

Manufacturer's price as used in this section is the established price at which a manufacturer sells to a wholesaler.

(B) As used in this section, "cigarette" means:

(1) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco wrapped in paper or in any substance other than a tobacco leaf; or

(2) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, wrapped in any substance, weighing three pounds per thousand or less, however labeled or named, which because of its appearance, size, type of tobacco used in the filler, or its packaging, pricing, marketing, or labeling, is likely to be offered to, or purchased by, consumers as a cigarette described in item (1) of this subsection.

SECTION 2.  This act takes effect October 1, 2025.

----XX----

This web page was last updated on May 01, 2025 at 08:31 PM