South Carolina 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina Senate Bill S0326 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/21/2025

                    SOUTH CAROLINA REVENUE AND FISCAL AFFAIRS OFFICE 
S
TATEMENT OF ESTIMATED FISCAL IMPACT 
WWW.RFA.SC.GOV • (803)734-3793  
 
This fiscal impact statement is produced in compliance with the South Carolina Code of Laws and House and Senate rules. The focus of 
the analysis is on governmental expenditure and revenue impacts and may not provide a comprehensive summary of the legislation. 
__________________________________ 
Frank A. Rainwater, Executive Director  
 
DISCLAIMER: THIS FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT REPRESENTS THE OPINION AND INTERPRETATION OF THE 
AGENCY OFFICIAL WHO APPROVED AND SIGNED THIS DOCUMENT. IT IS PROVIDED AS INFORMATION TO 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY AND IS NOT TO BE CONSIDERED AS AN EXPRESSION OF LEGISLATIVE INTENT. 
Page 1 of 1 
S. 0326 
 
Fiscal Impact Summary 
This bill requires any fuel station under construction or undertaking significant renovations after 
January 1, 2025, located within a half mile of a designated evacuation route or located on a state 
primary highway to install wiring capable of connecting a backup generator to power the 
station’s fuel pumps, cash registers, and essential lighting.  Additionally, any operational fuel 
station that is part of a chain operating ten or more locations in the state must install such wiring 
by January 1, 2026.  Fuel stations subject to these requirements must certify compliance to the 
Department of Environmental Services (DES), which shall oversee enforcement in coordination 
with local emergency management officials.  There is no expenditure impact to DES since any 
additional responsibilities required by the bill will be managed with existing staff. 
Explanation of Fiscal Impact 
Introduced on February 6, 2025 
State Expenditure 
This bill requires any fuel station under construction or undertaking significant renovations after 
January 1, 2025, located within a half mile of a designated evacuation route or located on a state 
primary highway to install wiring capable of connecting a backup generator to power the 
station’s fuel pumps, cash registers, and essential lighting.  Additionally, any operational fuel 
station that is part of a chain operating ten or more locations in the state must install such wiring 
by January 1, 2026.  Fuel stations subject to these requirements must certify compliance to DES, 
which shall oversee enforcement in coordination with local emergency management officials.  
DES reports that any additional responsibilities required by the bill will be managed with 
existing staff in its Underground Storage Tank Program.  Therefore, there is no expenditure 
impact to DES. 
 
State Revenue 
N/A 
 
Local Expenditure & Local Revenue 
N/A 
 
 
Bill Number: S. 0326  Introduced on Februar
y 6, 2025 
Subject: South Carolina Emer gency Fuel Supply Act 
Requestor: Senate A griculture and Natural Resources 
RFA Analyst(s): Griffith 
Impact Date: February 21, 2025